Grimm v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stanley Scott Grimm
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00388
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN... The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/13/2019) (wxc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mack, Cristin)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #5 ... the Court DENIES the motion as MOOT. Aetna may rely upon the expanded time-frame provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a) in response to the filing of the amended complaint for any extension needed. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/4/2019) (wxc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company filed by Stanley Scott Grimm. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Humphreys, Mark)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT... Plaintiffs amended complaint must be electronically filed with the clerk of the Court no later than June 13, 2019. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in appropriate sanctions, including the dismissal of Plaintiffs claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/15/2019) (wxc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Mack, Cristin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mathisen, Eric)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Mack, Cristin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 352nd District Court of Tarrant County, Texas, case number 352-307354-19 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9976526) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 1-1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court File, #2 1-2 Exhibits 1 - 4, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Mack, Cristin) Modified on 5/9/2019 (wxc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimm v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Scott Grimm
Represented By: Mark S Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Cristin J Mack
Represented By: Eric P Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?