American Airlines Inc v. Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO et al

Plaintiff: American Airlines Inc
Defendant: Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO, Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM and International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers
Case Number: 4:2019cv00414
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 120 Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #119 Post-Trial Brief (edm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 119 Post-Trial Brief by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE OF FILING LIST OF AIRCRAFT MECHANICS WHO ATTENDED MEETING PURSUANT TO THE MODIFIED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER DATED JULY 10, 2019 filed by Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 117 COMPLIANCE DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying #112 Motion for Reconsideration (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/16/2019) (dgt) (Modified on 7/17/19 Main Document 116 replaced to add file stamp to order) (chmb).
July 16, 2019 Filing 115 Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #114 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. (edm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 114 Memorandum in Opposition filed by American Airlines Inc re: #112 MOTION to Reconsider. (edm)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: The court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on July 16, 2019, plaintiff file a response to such Motion #112 to Reconsider. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/15/2019) (edm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION to Reconsider re #111 Order Modifying Temporary Restraining Order and Brief in Support filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers. (edm)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Immediate Modification of the TRO. IT IS ORDERED that the June 14, 2019 Temporary Restraining Order remains in full force and effect, and the Union remains adequately indemnified by the bond previously obtained by American, with the following additional requirements imposed on Defendants (see order for specifics). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 10:00 a.m. on the fifth business day following issuance of these modifications, Defendants shall, by sworn declarations, confirm the steps taken toward compliance with each of the above requirements. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/10/2019) (dgt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 110 Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #108 Motion for Immediate Modification of Temporary Restraining Order. (edm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 109 Memorandum in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #108 Motion for Immediate Modification of Temporary Restraining Order. (edm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 108 Motion for Immediate Modification of Temporary Restraining Order filed by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 107 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Permanent Injunction Hearing Proceedings held on 7/1/19 before Judge John McBryde. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Saenz, Telephone number 817.850.6661 or debbie.saenz@yahoo.com. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (248 pages) Redaction Request due 7/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019. (dgs) (Main Document 107 replaced on 7/16/2019) (tle).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER... The court further ORDERS that defendants, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, and Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, be, and are hereby, granted an extension of time until July 25, 2019, in which to file responses to such brief providing their arguments, citations, discussion, and references supporting their desired outcomes. The court further ORDERS that plaintiff be, and is hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00p.m. on July 30, 2019, in which to file a reply providing its arguments, citations, discussion, and references responsive to the response filed by defendants. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/3/2019) (wxc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: The court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on July 15, 2019, plaintiff, American Airlines, Inc., file a brief providing its arguments on the legal issues determinative of the outcome of this action and citations to the applicable authorities and a discussion of the facts supporting its desired outcome and references to evidence in the record establishing each of those facts. The court further ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on July 22, 2019, defendants file responses to such brief providing the above-described arguments, citations, discussion, and references. The court further ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on July 29, 2019, plaintiff file a reply in support of such briefing. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/2/2019) (edm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 105 Court's Exhibit List from Preliminary Injunction hearing and Non-Jury Trial held 7/1/2019. (edm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 104 Court's Witness List as to Plaintiff's from Preliminary Injunction hearing and Non-Jury Trial held 7/1/2019. (edm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 103 Court's Witness List as to Defendant' from Preliminary Injunction hearing and Non-Jury Trial held 7/1/2019. (edm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge John McBryde: Combined preliminary injunction hearing and non-jury trial held on 7/1/2019; Rulings made on plaintiff's objections to Exs. 54 and 62; Witnesses sworn; Witnesses testified; Rule invoked; Exhibits admitted: 1-9, 11-12, 14-16, 18, 21-31, 33-39, 41-42, 45-53, 54 subject to earlier rulings 55-61, 62 subject to earlier rulings, 63-90, 91 as to settlement agreement, 92-103, 106-109, 111-113, 115-124, 126-167, 170 in redacted form, 174-177, 180-193; Plaintiff to file brief by July 15; Defendants to file responses within 7 days; plaintiff to file reply within 5 days; Hearing concluded. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Lars Berg, Mark Robertson, Bob Siegel, Elizabeth Cuneo, Dee Kelly, Jr., Charles Mahoney, Sloane Ackerman, Rachel Janger, Lucretia Guia; Plaintiff's corporate representative David Seymour; Counsel for defendants Transport Workers Union of America and Airline Mechanis and Related Employee Association - Mark Richard and Osnat Rind; Counsel for Defendant International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers and the Association; Jeffrey Bartos and Antonia Bird; Defendants' local counsel: Sanford Denison; TWU' corporate representative: Gary Peterson; IAM's corporate representative - Joseph Tiberi (Court Reporter: Debbie Saenz) (Exhibits - Admitted) Time in Court - 5:18. (edm)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Memorandum Opinion : The the court concludes that a union has aduty to take every reasonable effort to stop its members' unlawful concerted activity, even if they have not participatedin, authorized, or ratified it. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/28/2019) (edm)
June 27, 2019 Filing 99 RESPONSE filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO re: #96 Notice Regarding Temporary Restraining Order Compliance and Proposed Permanent Injunction Order. (edm)
June 27, 2019 Filing 98 JOINT STATUS REPORT ON CONFERENCE REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO AUDIO OR VIDEO RECORDINGS TO BE USED AT TRIAL filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, American Airlines Inc, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 97 Appendix filed by American Airlines Inc re #96 Notice Regarding Temporary Restraining Order Compliance and Proposed Permanent Injunction Order. (Attachments: #1 pgs 51-113) (edm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 96 Notice Regarding Temporary Restraining Order Compliance and Proposed Permanent Injunction Order filed by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge John McBryde: Telephone Conference re: parties' objections to evidence held on 6/25/2019; Rulings made on parties' objections to evidence; conference concluded. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Lars Berg, Elizabeth Cuneo, Mark Robertson,; Defense - Mark Richard, Osnat Rind - Transport Worker Union of America and Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association, Jeffrey Bartos and Antonia Bird - International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers and the Association. (Court Reporter: Debbie Saenz) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 01:35. (edm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 94 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Declaration Testimony filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO re: #72 (wxc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 93 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff American Airlines, Inc.'s Objections to Defendants' Submission of Video Recording filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO re: #87 (wxc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 92 PROPOSED CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND FINDINGS OF FACT filed by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 91 BRIEF ON THE CONTESTED ISSUES OF LAW filed by American Airlines Inc (edm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 90 DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSION OF LAW filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO (edm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 89 DEFENDANT'S BRIEF ON CONTESTED ISSUES OF LAW filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO (edm)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: The court ORDERS that if any of the defendants wish to respond to any of such #87 objections, they must do so by filing a response in the above-captioned action by 4:00 p.m. on June 25, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/24/2019) (bdb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 87 Objections to Defendants' Submission of Video Recording filed by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 86 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, American Airlines Inc, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: The court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on June 24, 2019, each party proposing to offer at trial an exhibit to which another party has an objection deliver a copy of that exhibit to chambers. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/20/2019) (edm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 84 Exhibit List by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 83 Exhibit List by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 82 Witness List by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 81 Joint Trial Exhibit List by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, American Airlines Inc, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 80 Witness List by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 79 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 6/18/19 before Judge John McBryde. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debbie Saenz, Telephone number 817.850.6661 or debbie.saenz@yahoo.com. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (34 pages) Redaction Request due 7/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2019. (dgs)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: The court ORDERS that such Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until the court renders a final judgment disposing of all claims and causes of action asserted in the above-captioned action. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/18/2019) (edm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 77 Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #76 Reply (edm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY filed by American Airlines Inc re: #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (edm)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER... (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/18/2019) (edm)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: In accordance with the discussions had at the pretrial conference in the above-captioned action held this date, The court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on June 24, 2019, each party file a brief on the contested issues of law listed in paragraphs (2)-(5) of pages 19-20 of the parties' Joint Pre-Trial Order. The court further ORDERS that the deadline for each party to file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, set in paragraph 10 of page 4 of the court's June 4, 2019 Order Setting Schedule and Providing Special Pretrial Instructions, be, and is hereby, extended to 4:00p.m. on June 24, 2019. The court further ORDERS that the trial of the above-captioned action be, and is hereby, reset to commence at 9:00 a.m. on July 1, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/18/2019) (edm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge John McBryde: Pretrial Conference held on 6/18/2019; Issues pertaining to trial discussed; each party ordered to file by 4:00 p.m. on June 24, 2019 brief on contested issues if law listed in pp 19-20, 2-5 of Joint Pre-Trial order; Deadline to file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law extended to 4:00 p.m. on June 24, 2019; Trail reset to commence at 9:00 a.m. on july 1, 2019; Conference concluded. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Lars Berg, Elizabeth Cuneo, Robert Siegel,, Mark Robertson; Defense - Jeffrey Bartos for TWU and Association; Mark Richard for International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers and the Association; Local Counsel for all defendants - Sanford Denison (Court Reporter: Debbie Saenz) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :40. (edm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 72 Submission Regarding Declaration Testimony and Objections to Declaration Testimony filed by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 71 Declaration of Timothy Klima by International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers. (edm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 70 Declaration of Gary Peterson by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 69 Appendix in Support filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, American Airlines Inc, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO re #68 Joint Submission Regarding Declaration Testimony. (Attachments: #1 pgs 50-99, #2 pgs 100-159) (edm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 68 Joint Submission Regarding Declaration Testimony filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, American Airlines Inc, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 67 Defendants' Declarants and Objections to Plaintiff's Declarations filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO (edm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 66 Confirmation of Payment received (Receipt # FW032843, $50,000) by American Airlines, Inc. (edm)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #58 Motion for TRO..the Union are enjoined from calling, permitting, instigating, authorizing, encouraging, participating in, approving or continuing any form of interference with American's airline operations...see order for specifics...Further ORDERED..the Union report to the Court by 10am Jun 18 2019, by sworn affidavit, the methods used to effect the notice described to all its members and furnish the Court copies of all notices required under the TRO...This TRO is issued on the condition that a bond be filed by American on or before 10am June 17 2019 in the sum of $50,000 and that the Union shall recover from American under said bond all loss, expenses, damages and costs, including reasonable atty fees in defense against this order, if any, suffered by them in the event that American does not succeed in this action. So ordered at 5:00 pm, this 14th day of June, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/14/2019) (wrb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge John McBryde: Telephone Conference held on 6/14/2019. Conference concluded. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Lars Berg, Elizabeth Cuneo, Robert Siegel, Mark Robertson; Defense - Mark Richard and Osnat Rind. Counsel for all defendants: Sanford Denison. Counsel for defts IAMAW and the Assn: Jeffrey Bartos and Antonio Bird (Court Reporter: Debbie Saenz) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :22. (wrb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines Inc re #60 Appendix to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (wrb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 62 Appendix filed by American Airlines Inc to Plaintiff's #61 List of Recordings and Transcripts to be Used at Trial (wrb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 61 Plaintiff's List of Records and Transcripts to be Used at Trial filed by American Airlines Inc. (wrb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 60 Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #58 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 pgs 51-101, #2 pgs 102-142) (edm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 59 Brief in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #58 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (edm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by American Airlines Inc (edm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 57 JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, American Airlines Inc, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 56 Notice of Filing Transcript and Compliance with this Court's Order filed by American Airlines Inc (edm)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: In order to conserve trial time, the court expects the parties to the above-captioned action to devote the necessary time and attention to the reaching of agreement on accuracy of transcripts of audio or video recordings that might be used in the trial of the action. (see order for further specifics) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/11/2019) (edm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Intent to Use Video or Audio Recording filed by Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Intent to Use a Video and Audio Recording and Transcripts filed by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 52 Defendants' RESPONSE In Opposition filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO to Plaintiff's #17 MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Brief (wrb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 51 Designation of Expert Witness by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 50 Designation of Expert Witness by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association WU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (edm)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The court ORDERS that paragraph 15 of the order settingschedule the court issued in the above-captioned action onJune 4, 2019, be, and is hereby, modified to the extent providedby this order. The court ORDERS that by 10:00 a.m. on June 18, 2019, eachparty file in this action a document that provides the followinginformation (see order for specifics). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/6/2019) (edm)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Antonia Bird. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/6/2019) (edm)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Bartos. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/6/2019) (edm)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lucia Piva. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/6/2019) (edm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Leave to Submit Witness Testimony by Declaration at Trial filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, American Airlines Inc, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Antonia Bird (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032782) filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jeffrey A. Bartos (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032781) filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers. (bdb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lucia Piva (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032780) filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (bdb)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE AND PROVIDING SPECIAL PRETRIAL INSTRUCTIONS: Defendants shall file and serve their answers to plaintiff's complaint by 6/10/2019. Defendants shall file and serve response to motion for preliminary injunction by 6/11/2019. Plaintiff shall file reply by 6/18/2019 Discovery due by 6/10/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 10:00 AM before Senior Judge John McBryde. Non-Jury Trial set for 7/1/2019 10:00 AM before Senior Judge John McBryde. (see order for further specifics) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/4/2019) (edm)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina Gornail. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/3/2019) (tln)
June 3, 2019 Filing 38 JOINT REPORT PROPOSING DISCOVERY AND TRIAL SCHEDULE by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, American Airlines Inc, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (tln)
June 3, 2019 Filing 37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christina S. Gornail (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032761) filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (tln)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Richard. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/29/2019) (edm)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Osnat K Rind. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/29/2019) (edm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Mark Richard (Filing fee $25; Receipt number Fw032746) filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO Attorney Mark Richard added to party Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM(pty:dft) (edm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Osnat K. Rind (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032746) filed by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO Attorney Osnat K Rind added to party Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM(pty:dft) (edm)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Janger. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/28/2019) (edm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Rachel S. Janger (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032743) filed by American Airlines Inc Attorney Rachel S Janger added to party American Airlines Inc(pty:pla) (edm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 29 Disclosure of Trial Witnesses by Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed on 5/21/2019 as to Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO re: #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #18 Memorandum of Law in Support, #19 appendix in Support, #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (edm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM ; served on 5/21/2019; International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers ; served on 5/21/2019; Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO ; served on 5/21/2019. (edm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 26 Disclosure of Trial Witnesses by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 25 Supplementary Appendix to Memorandum of Law in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (edm)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Consistent with the telephone conference hearing held this date, The court ORDERS that by 2:00 p.m. on May 23, 2019, plaintiff, American Airlines, Inc., file in this action a document providing the identities of the persons plaintiff anticipates calling as witnesses at trial', along with a description of the subject matter of each witness's anticipated testimony; and that such descriptions be general, but specific enough that defendants can determine their needs regarding responsive witnesses. The court further ORDERS that by 2:00 p.m. on May 28, 2019, each defendant file in this action a document providing the identities of the persons it anticipates calling as witnesses at trial and a description of the subject matter of each witness's anticipated testimony. The court further ORDERS that by 2:00 p.m. on June 3, 2019, the parties jointly file in this action a document providing their agreed proposed trial date and deadlines for completing discovery. (see order for further specifics) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/21/2019) (edm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge John McBryde: Telephone Conference re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 5/21/2019; Deadlines set; Order to follow; Conference concluded. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Lars Berg, Elizabeth Cuneo, Robert Siegel, Sloane Ackerman, Mark Robertson, Rachel Janger; Defense - March Richard and Osi rind for Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO and Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM; Jeffrey Bartos and Antonio Bird for International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers and the Association. (Court Reporter: Debbie Saenz) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :18. (edm)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Siegel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/21/2019) (edm)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Robertson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/21/2019) (edm)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sloane Ackerman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/21/2019) (edm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 pgs 51-101, #2 pgs 102-152, #3 pgs 153-203, #4 pgs 204-254, #5 pgs 255-323) (edm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by American Airlines Inc re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (edm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Airlines Inc. (edm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Mark W. Robertson (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032718) filed by American Airlines Inc Attorney Mark W Robertson added to party American Airlines Inc(pty:pla) (edm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Robert A Siegel (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032718) filed by American Airlines Inc. Attorney Robert A Siegel added to party American Airlines Inc(pty:pla) (edm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Sloane Ackerman (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW032718) filed by American Airlines Inc Attorney Sloane Ackerman added to party American Airlines Inc(pty:pla) (edm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of documents #1 , and #2 filed by American Airlines Inc (edm)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The court ORDERS that, at 3:00 p.m. on May 21, 2019, there be a telephone conference between the court, lead counsel for plaintiff, and, if known to plaintiff's lead counsel, counsel for defendants. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/20/2019) (edm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. (edm)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/20/2019) (edm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by American Airlines Inc. (Berg, Lars)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by American Airlines Inc. (Berg, Lars)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by American Airlines Inc. (Berg, Lars)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by American Airlines Inc. (Berg, Lars)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by American Airlines Inc. (Berg, Lars)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by American Airlines Inc. (Berg, Lars)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Airlines Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate American Airlines Group Inc. for American Airlines Inc. (Berg, Lars)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by American Airlines Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9997496) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Berg, Lars)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Airlines Inc v. Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Airlines Inc
Represented By: Lars L Berg
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Cuneo
Represented By: Dee J Kelly, Jr
Represented By: Mark W Robertson
Represented By: Sloane Ackerman
Represented By: Robert A Siegel
Represented By: Rachel Janger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Christina S Gornail
Represented By: Osnat K Rind
Represented By: Sanford R Denison
Represented By: Lucia Piva
Represented By: Mark Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airline Mechanic and Related Employee Association TWU/IAM
Represented By: Christina S Gornail
Represented By: Antonia Bird
Represented By: Osnat K Rind
Represented By: Sanford R Denison
Represented By: Lucia Piva
Represented By: Mark Richard
Represented By: Jeffrey A Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers
Represented By: Antonia Bird
Represented By: Sanford R Denison
Represented By: Jeffrey A Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?