Crawley v. Companion Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jason Lee Crawley
Defendant: Companion Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00418
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Designation of Experts by Jason Lee Crawley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-MSH CV) (Humphreys, Mark)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jason Lee Crawley. (Humphreys, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 8/23/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2019. Motions due by 2/10/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/20/2019. Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2020. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning June 22, 2020 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/24/2019) (skg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order by Companion Life Insurance Company. (Bullock, Kenneth)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before June 25, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/28/2019) (skg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Companion Life Insurance Company. (Bullock, Kenneth)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 348th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, case number 348-307380-19 filed by Companion Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10001524) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C-1, #4 Exhibit(s) C-2, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Bullock, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawley v. Companion Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companion Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth Wayne Bullock
Represented By: Dennis Siaw-Lattey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lee Crawley
Represented By: Mark S Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?