Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company v. Deere & Company
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Defendant: Deere & Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00425
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Taylor, David)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer the allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until fourteen (14) days after the Court rules on the pending Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/21/2019) (skg)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michelle D. Hurley. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/21/2019) (chmb)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David J. Taylor. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/21/2019) (chmb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michelle D. Hurley (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10065403) filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sebesta, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David J. Taylor (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10065318) filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sebesta, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Deere & Company (Zinnecker, Ben)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deere & Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)Attorney Ben T Zinnecker added to party Deere & Company(pty:dft) (Zinnecker, Ben)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Deere & Company ; served on 5/29/2019. (Sebesta, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deere & Company. (edm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deere & Company filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company as subrogee of CWH Farms. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10008814) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Sebesta, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company v. Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: William Thomas Sebesta
Represented By: Randall J Poelma, Jr
Represented By: David J Taylor
Represented By: Michelle Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Ben T Zinnecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?