Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Arlington Ink et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Alejandro Martinez Chairez, Nicholas Ochoa, Arlington Ink and Alejandro Martinez
Case Number: 4:2019cv00450
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL JUDGMENT: The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims and causes of action of plaintiff, Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., against defendants, Arlington Ink, Nicholas Ochoa d/b/a Arlington Ink, and Alejandro Martinez Chairez a/k/a Alejandro Martinez and d/b/a Arlington Ink, be, and are hereby, dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/22/2019) (bdb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Arlington Ink, Joe Hand Promotions Inc, Alejandro Martinez Chairez, Nicholas Ochoa. (tln)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4:00 p.m. on 8/21/2019. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/22/2019) (tln)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Arlington Ink, Alejandro Martinez Chairez, Nicholas Ochoa. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Unfiling #12 Answer to Complaint filed by Alejandro Martinez Chairez, Arlington Ink, Nicholas Ochoa due to the following deficiency: All documents filed in any case on the docket of the undersigned shall... [comply with] the undersigned's judge-specific requirements. Included therein is the following requirement: None of the items filed with the papers in this action is to be signed by a law firm, as opposed to individual attorneys who are admitted or authorized to practice before this court pursuant to the provisions of Local Civil Rules LR 83.7, LR 83.9, or LR 83.10. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/10/2019) (tln)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 ***UNFILED/STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER***ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Arlington Ink, Alejandro Martinez Chairez, Nicholas Ochoa. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (tln).
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service re Summons Returned Executed as to Nicholas Ochoa; served on 6/25/2019. (tln)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service re Summons Returned Executed as to Arlington Ink; served on 6/25/2019. (tln)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Designation of Local Counsel by David M Walsh, IV on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (tln)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court notes that plaintiff's attorney, Jamie Renee King, does not appear to reside or have her principal office in this district or within fifty miles of the courthouse of the Fort Worth Division of this district. Local Civil Rule LR 83.10(a). This is not the type of action in which an exception to the requirement of local counsel would be made. Local Civil Rule LR 83.11. Therefore, the court ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on June 24, 2019, plaintiff file an appropriate written designation of local counsel. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of plaintiff's claims and causes of action against defendants, Arlington Ink, Nicholas Ochoa, and Alejandro Martinez Chairez, without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/12/2019) (tln)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #3 Standing Order. (tln)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (tln)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (tln)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Arlington Ink, Alejandro Martinez Chairez, Nicholas Ochoa. (tln)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/6/2019) (tln)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10032996) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Arlington Ink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Martinez Chairez
Represented By: Martin Ivon Muizers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Ochoa
Represented By: Martin Ivon Muizers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlington Ink
Represented By: Martin Ivon Muizers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Martinez
Represented By: Martin Ivon Muizers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: David M Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?