Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ink Love LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Ink Love LLC and Daniel Costilla, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00472
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Clerk's notice to ECF Users in cases transferred under SO 3-329 from Judge John McBryde to Judge Mark Pittman: Judge Pittman permits electronic filing. His copy requirements for electronically filed documents are as follows: Sealed documents, dispositive motions, responses, replies, and appendices thereto and filings more than 25 pages in length, placed in a 3-ring binder, with exhibits or attachments tabbed, indexed, and bound. Delivery instructions are available in the link to the Judges' Copy Requirements found at the top of the notice of electronic filing sent to affected ECF users. (lrl)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service Executed on 6/27/19 as to Daniel Costilla, Jr re: #4 Summons Issued. (wrb)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 8/19/2019 by 4pm (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/19/2019) (wrb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Costilla, Jr, Ink Love LLC. (tln)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Unfiling #9 Answer to Complaint,, filed by Daniel Costilla, Jr., Ink Love LLC, #10 Certificate of Service filed by Daniel Costilla, Jr., Ink Love LLC due to the following deficiency: Pleadings do not bear original signatures. re: #9 Answer to Complaint,, #10 Certificate of Service (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/16/2019) (wrb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 [unfiled per order of 7/16/19] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (NOD) by Daniel Costilla, Jr, Ink Love LLC re #9 Answer to Complaint (wrb) Modified on 7/17/2019 (wrb).
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 [unfiled per order of 7/16/19] Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint (NOD) filed by Daniel Costilla, Jr, Ink Love LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Jim R Ross added to party Daniel Costilla, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jim R Ross added to party Ink Love LLC(pty:dft) (wrb) Modified on 7/17/2019 (wrb).
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Service by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (wxc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Designation of lead counsel David Michael Walsh IV for Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (wxc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (wrb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Received original and Judge's copy of Case Initiating Document pursuant to Standing Order re: #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (wrb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wrb)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/17/2019) (wrb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10054571) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ink Love LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: David M Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ink Love LLC
Represented By: Jim R Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Costilla, Jr.
Represented By: Jim R Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?