United States of America v. Kessie
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kingsley K Kessie
Case Number: 4:2019cv00473
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Jul 31 13:53:19 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before August 28, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/31/2019) (skg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Kingsley K Kessie. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kingsley K Kessie. (bdb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by United States of America. (Yepuri, Moha)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingsley K Kessie filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Yepuri, Moha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kessie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsley K Kessie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Moha Yepuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?