Weslease 2018 Operating, LP v. Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Weslease 2018 Operating, LP
Defendant: Linda Behan and Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00555
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 9/23/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/23/2019) (wxc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER of Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC, and Counterclaim to #1 Complaint, filed by Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Weslease 2018 Operating, LP filed by Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC (wxc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER of Linda Behan to #1 Complaint, filed by Linda Behan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER UNFILING DOCUMENT... #8 This case is not designated for electronic filing. All documents should be filed in traditional paper form, bearing the original signature of the filer. Also see the standing order docketed in this action on July 12, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/23/2019) (wxc)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER UNFILING #9 due to the following deficiency: This case is not designated for electronic filing. All documents should be filed in traditional paper form, bearing the original signature of the filer. Also see standing order docketed in this action on July 12, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/23/2019) (wxc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #10 *** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Linda Behan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney J Shelby Sharpe added to party Linda Behan(pty:dft) (Sharpe, J) Modified on 8/23/2019 (wxc).
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #11 *** Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Weslease 2018 Operating, LP filed by Innovative Sand Solutions, LLCAttorney J Shelby Sharpe added to party Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC(pty:dft) (Sharpe, J) Modified on 8/23/2019 (wxc).
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy pursuant to the standing order of document #1 filed by Weslease 2018 Operating, LP (edm)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Unfiling #5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies filed by Weslease 2018 Operating, LP due to the following deficiency: The paper copy of the complaint bears a typewritten signature. And, the exhibits to said complaint are not contained in a separate volume. The court ORDERS that the above-described item be, and is hereby, unfiled and stricken from the record. The court further ORDERS that plaintiff be, and is hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00 p.m. on July 19, 2019, in which to file in proper form its complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/16/2019) (edm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 *** UNFILED AND STRICKEN PER ORDER #6 *** Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of document #1 filed by Weslease 2018 Operating, LP (edm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Linda Behan, Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC. (edm)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/12/2019) (edm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Weslease 2018 Operating, LP. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10112793) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Cover Sheet, #22 Certificate) (Austin, Brandy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weslease 2018 Operating, LP v. Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weslease 2018 Operating, LP
Represented By: Jennefer Lowe
Represented By: Brandy Michelle Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Behan
Represented By: J Shelby Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Sand Solutions, LLC
Represented By: J Shelby Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?