Roberson v. Wilson
Petitioner: Benjamin Lamont Roberson
Respondent: Warden Eric D Wilson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00564
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by Eric D Wilson re #10 Response/Objection (Cruce-Haag-DOJ, Ann)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Eric D Wilson re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Cruce-Haag-DOJ, Ann)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eric D Wilson. (Cruce-Haag-DOJ, Ann)
August 9, 2019 Clerk's notice to ECF Users in cases transferred under SO 3-329 from Judge John McBryde to Judge Mark Pittman: Judge Pittman permits electronic filing. His copy requirements for electronically filed documents are as follows: Sealed documents, dispositive motions, responses, replies, and appendices thereto and filings more than 25 pages in length, placed in a 3-ring binder, with exhibits or attachments tabbed, indexed, and bound. Delivery instructions are available in the link to the Judges' Copy Requirements found at the top of the notice of electronic filing sent to affected ECF users. (lrl)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Satisfaction of Deficiency filed by Benjamin Lamont Roberson. (edm)
July 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Jul 31 12:37:55 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the petition and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Show Cause Response due by 8/30/2019. Reply due by September 10, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/31/2019) (edm)
July 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, IFP with Certificate of Inmate Trust Account Thu Jul 18 11:09:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Benjamin Lamont Roberson must address the following deficiency: the $5.00 filing fee has not been paid nor has an application to proceed in forma pauperis and certificate of inmate trust account been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/18/2019) (edm)
July 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3,4. Wed Jul 17 15:15:04 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/17/2019) (edm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (edm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney PW. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Benjamin Lamont Roberson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (edm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benjamin Lamont Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Eric D Wilson
Represented By: Ann Cruce-Haag-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?