Kaswatuka v. Park Place Motocars Midcities Mercedes
Plaintiff: Dina S. Kaswatuka and Dina Senga Kaswatuka
Defendant: Park Place Motocars Midcities Mercedes
Case Number: 4:2019cv00569
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Cureton
Referring Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Park Place Motocars Midcities Mercedes filed by Dina Senga Kaswatuka. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Reinstate filed by Dina Senga Kaswatuka. (tln)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, all claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to their refiling. All costs of Court under 28 U.S.C. 1920 shall be borne by Plaintiff. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/11/2019) (tln)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In an order filed on August 2, 2019, the Court directed that if Plaintiff desired to pursue her claims in this cause, she must file an amended complaint no later than August 23, 2019, that properly invoked the subject-matter jurisdiction of this Court. The order warned that failure to timely comply would result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims. As of the date of this order, Plaintiff has failed to comply with the August 2 order. It is, therefore, ORDERED that all claims in this case are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to their refiling in a court of competent jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/11/2019) (tln)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for the Appointment of Counsel (doc. #2 ). After review of the motion, Defendant's response, and the applicable law, the Court concludes that the motion should be and hereby is DENIED. Furthermore, the Court has directed by separate order that Plaintiff file an amended complaint more particularly setting out the basis for this Court's exercise of jurisdiction. Until the Court is satisfied that it has jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claims, it is not inclined to appoint counsel on Plaintiff's behalf. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/2/2019) (tln)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT: It is, therefore, ORDERED that if Plaintiff desires to pursue her claims in this cause, she shall file, no later than August 23, 2019, an amended complaint that includes a jurisdictional paragraph and alleges sufficient facts to demonstrate that this Court may exercise subject-matter jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claims and that Plaintiff has a plausible claim for relief. Plaintiff is advised that her amended complaint will totally replace her original complaint; thus any matters alleged in her original complaint that she desires to pursue must be re-alleged in her amended complaint. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims for lack of jurisdiction and/or prosecution. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/2/2019) (tln)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND NOTICE AND ORDER: It is therefore RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [docket no. #4 ] be DENIED by the district judge. It is further RECOMMENDED that the district judge inform Plaintiff that the complaint will be subject to dismissal without further notice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), unless Plaintiff pays to the clerk of Court the filing and administrative fees of $400.00 within seven (7) days after the district judge's order. Under 28 U.S.C. 636, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted until August 7, 2019 to serve and file written objections to the United States Magistrate Judge's proposed findings, conclusions and recommendation. It is further ORDERED that the above-styled and numbered action, previously referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for findings, conclusions and recommendation, be and is hereby, RETURNED to the docket of the United States District Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 7/24/2019) (tln)
July 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Fri Jul 19 16:25:06 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (bdb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dina S. Kaswatuka. (bdb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dina S. Kaswatuka. (bdb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Dina S. Kaswatuka. (bdb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Park Place Motocars Midcities Mercedes filed by Dina S. Kaswatuka. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaswatuka v. Park Place Motocars Midcities Mercedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Place Motocars Midcities Mercedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina S. Kaswatuka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Senga Kaswatuka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?