Sandefur v. Phillip Galyen, P.C. D/B/A Bailey & Galyen et al
Plaintiff: Kerri Sandefur
Respondent: Phillip Galyen and Phillip Galyen PC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00586
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-00147. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ND/TX, FORT WORTH DIVISION re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Phillip Galyen, P.C., Phillip Galyen. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Transfer Case Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer: Pretrial Conference held on 7/25/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2019 GRANTED re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Phillip Galyen, P.C., Phillip Galyen (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR-Gold.)(wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Kerri Sandefur. (Welmaker, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Recommendations by Kerri Sandefur. (Welmaker, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2019,, Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer for disposition of any and all pretrial matters and motions, including Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Fort Worth Division. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 DEFENDANT'S REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Phillip Galyen, Phillip Galyen, P.C., re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Phillip Galyen, P.C., Defendant Phillip Galyen (Maxwell, Stephen) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kerri Sandefur, re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Phillip Galyen, P.C., Defendant Phillip Galyen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Welmaker, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response on or before April 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Kerri Sandefur. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Welmaker, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by Phillip Galyen, Phillip Galyen, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Transfer, #2 Appendix Appendix Index, #3 Appendix Exhibit A)(Maxwell, Stephen) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Stephen C. Maxwell added to party Phillip Galyen, P.C.(pty:dft) by Phillip Galyen, P.C..(Maxwell, Stephen) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Stephen C. Maxwell added to party Phillip Galyen(pty:dft) by Phillip Galyen.(Maxwell, Stephen) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Phillip Galyen, Phillip Galyen, P.C.. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kerri Sandefur. (Welmaker, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Kerri Sandefur. (Welmaker, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11772128), filed by Kerri Sandefur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welmaker, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 7/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandefur v. Phillip Galyen, P.C. D/B/A Bailey & Galyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Sandefur
Represented By: Douglas B Welmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phillip Galyen
Represented By: Stephen C Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phillip Galyen PC
Represented By: Stephen C Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?