Northwest Pipe Company et al v. Signify Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Northwest Pipe Company and ACE American Insurance Company
Defendant: Venture Lighting International, Inc., Signify North America Corporation and Signify Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00591
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT...the claims of plaintiffs against defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Each party bear the court costs incurred by that party. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/18/2019) (wrb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ACE American Insurance Company, Northwest Pipe Company (wrb)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tracey A. Jordan; granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George D. Pilja. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/14/2019) (tln)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney George D. Pilja (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW033160) filed by ACE American Insurance Company, Northwest Pipe Company. (tln)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Tracey A. Jordan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW033159) filed by ACE American Insurance Company, Northwest Pipe Company. (tln)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Signify Corporation. Waiver sent on 8/6/2019. (tln)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Signify North America Corporation. Waiver sent on 8/6/2019. (tln)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by ACE American Insurance Company, Northwest Pipe Company. (wrb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Received original and judge's copy of case initiating document pursuant to Standing Order re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by ACE American Insurance Company, Northwest Pipe Company (wrb)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/31/2019) (wrb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Northwest Pipe Company, ACE American Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10153366) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Boteler, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Pipe Company et al v. Signify Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Pipe Company
Represented By: James J Boteler
Represented By: Tracey Jordan
Represented By: George Pilja
Represented By: Brian Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: James J Boteler
Represented By: Tracey Jordan
Represented By: George Pilja
Represented By: Brian Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Lighting International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signify North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signify Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?