Kennedy v. O'Connor et al
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Defendant: The Administrative Office of the United States Courts, Reed Charles O'Connor, John Glover Roberts, United States Courts and Jeffrey L Cureton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00593
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-11009 in United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit for #13 Notice of Appeal. (tle)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 Received letter from United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit re: No. 19-11009. We have docketed the appeal as shown above, and ask you to use the case number above in future inquiries. (tle)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL and (Objection) as to #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #11 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure, #12 Judgment, to the Fifth Circuit. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (tle)
August 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Wed Aug 14 10:01:21 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day, The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that all claims asserted by Plaintiff in this action be, and are hereby, DISMISSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/13/2019) (bdb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The court ORDERS that all Plaintiff's claims be, and are hereby, DISMISSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/13/2019) (bdb)
August 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Mon Aug 5 07:34:50 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #4 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND, DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PAY FULL FILING AND ADMINISTRATIVE FEES. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/2/2019) (tln)
August 2, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Fri Aug 2 16:36:42 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/1/2019) (bdb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
August 1, 2019 New case number 4:19-cv-00593-A Kennedy v. O'Connor et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 2:19cv0153-Z. Future filings should be made in the FORT WORTH division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
August 1, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Aug 1 08:30:12 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/1/2019) (nhp)
July 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. (Copy of 1st page of complaint also mailed to Plaintiff) Tue Jul 30 09:12:55 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Authorization to File Electronically filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Orders) (nhp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Service of Process filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (nhp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #2 Proposed Summons) (nhp).
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy (nhp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (nhp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (nhp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. O'Connor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Administrative Office of the United States Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Charles O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Glover Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L Cureton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?