Malone v. General Motors Financial Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anissa Malone
Defendant: General Motors Financial Company, Inc. and Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00618
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Americredit Financial Services, Inc. filed by Anissa Malone. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #18 ... The court ORDERS that the September 4, 2019 response be, andis hereby, unfiled and stricken from the record of such action.If plaintiff wishes to retrieve the items from the clerk'soffice, she must do so by 2:00p.m. on September 9, 2019.Otherwise, the items will be disposed of as the clerk sees fit. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/6/2019) (wxc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of documents #1 , #3 received. (wxc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #20 *** Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Anissa Malone re: #10 (wxc) Modified on 9/9/2019 (wxc).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER... The court ORDERS that the August 26, 2019 complaint be, and is hereby, unfiled and stricken from the record of such action. If plaintiff wishes to retrieve the items from the clerk's office, she must do so by 2:00p.m. on September 4, 2019. Otherwise, the items will be disposed of as the clerk sees fit. The court further ORDERS that plaintiff be, and is hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00p.m. on September 6, 2019 in which to file properly signed documents. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/30/2019) (wxc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors Financial Company, Inc.. (wxc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by General Motors Financial Company, Inc. re #13 (wxc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by General Motors Financial Company, Inc. re #13 (wxc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief can be Granted filed by General Motors Financial Company, Inc. Attorney Jay K Rutherford added to party General Motors Financial Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (wxc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Anissa Malone re: #10 (wxc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #17 *** Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of Documents #1 , #3 received. (wxc) Modified on 8/30/2019 (wxc).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE... The court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on August 29, 2019, plaintiff show cause by appropriate written filing why her claims should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/22/2019) (wxc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to General Motors Financial Company, Inc. ; served on 8/8/2019. (wxc)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER... On August 13, 2019, plaintiff, Anissa Malone, filed in paper form an original and judge's copy of her original complaint and jury demand (doc. 7) that failed to comply with that requirement because it does not bear the filing party's original signature. The court ORDERS that such document be, and is hereby, unfiled and stricken from the record of such action. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/15/2019) (wxc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #8 *** Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of documents #1 , #2 , #3 received. (wxc) Modified on 8/15/2019 (wxc).
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to General Motors Financial Company, Inc.. (wxc)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/7/2019) (wxc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anissa Malone. (Cole, Kyla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Anissa Malone. (Cole, Kyla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against General Motors Financial Company, Inc. filed by Anissa Malone. (Filer fee Paid - FW0539-10172480.) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Cole, Kyla) Modified on 8/7/2019 (wxc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. General Motors Financial Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Financial Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jay K Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anissa Malone
Represented By: Kyla G Cole
Represented By: Christine Neill
Represented By: Jane Legler Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?