Parish v. American Airlines, Inc. (JRG1)

Plaintiff: Elida Parish
Defendant: American Airlines Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00653
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The court ORDERS that defendant be, and is hereby granted leave to file by September 3, 2019, a further motion to dismiss in accordance with this order. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/20/2019) (tln)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/20/2019) (bdb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 Case electronically transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00141. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
August 20, 2019 Case transferred to the Northern District of Texas. Case electronically transferred. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss; granting #14 Motion to Change Venue. Having considered the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Order of Stay and to Transfer Venue [Doc. 14], and finding the Motion well taken and that it should be GRANTED, the Court orders the following: This case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. All deadlines and proceedings in this action shall be stayed pending the transfer of this action. The Clerk of the Court is hereby DIRECTED to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer. All outstanding motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/20/2019. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
August 9, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Change Venue Joint Motion for Entry of Order of Stay and to Transfer Venue by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Klauss, Logan) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Elida Parish. (Friauf, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 06/24/2019. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Klauss, Logan) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by American Airlines, Inc.. (Klauss, Logan) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 6/11/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 6/12/2019 to indicate c/m to Logan A Klauss (ABF). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elida Parish. Elida Parish waiver sent on 4/22/2019. (Friauf, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by American Airlines, Inc. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Logan Klauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3038152.) by American Airlines, Inc.. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for David I. Feigelson's to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90: K3038152) by American Airlines, Inc. (AYB) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/22/19. (JBR, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/22/19. (JBR, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/22/19. (JBR, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
April 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3951700.), filed by Elida Parish. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Other Waiver of Service of Summons)(Friauf, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 8/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parish v. American Airlines, Inc. (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc
Represented By: Logan A Klauss
Represented By: David I Feigelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elida Parish
Represented By: James W Friauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?