Torres v. Graham
Plaintiff: Gilbert Torres
Defendant: Aaron Clay Graham
Case Number: 4:2019cv00667
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6, 7. Tue Sep 10 16:10:05 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT. In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all of Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. All costs of court are taxed against the party who incurred them. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/10/2019) (trt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VOLUNTARY DISMISS CASE: It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff Gilbert Torres's September 6, 2019 letter to the Court, construed as a motion to voluntarily dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) (ECF No. 5), is GRANTED, such that all of Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/10/2019) (trt)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Public correspondence received from Gilbert Torres. (wxc)
August 28, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. , and a form application to proceed in forma pauperis (with cause number thereon) has been mailed to Plaintiff along with a certificate of inmate trust account for completion Wed Aug 28 14:59:44 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Gilbert Torres must address the following deficiency: If the prisoner plaintiff wishes to maintain this suit, he must either provide an IFP application (which will result in a fee collection from his inmate account) or pay the applicable fees. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/28/2019) (skg)
August 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Tue Aug 27 10:33:09 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1983) against Aaron Clay Graham filed by Gilbert Torres. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s)) (wxc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/27/2019) (wxc). Modified on 8/27/2019 (wxc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Clay Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?