Braggs v. Ray et al
Defendant: Tamla Ray, John R. Smith, Lisa Mullen and Sharen Wilson
Petitioner: Frederick Braggs
Case Number: 4:2019cv00668
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Thu Oct 3 16:24:57 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT... The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that all claims asserted by Plaintiff in this action be, and are hereby, DISMISSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/3/2019) (wxc)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL... The court ORDERS that Plaintiff's claims be, and are hereby, DISMISSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/3/2019) (wxc)
August 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Aug 29 11:27:20 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Frederick Braggs must address the following deficiency: A certificate of inmate trust account (or institutional equivalent) for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint has not been submitted as required pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2).. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/29/2019) (wxc)
August 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4,5. Tue Aug 27 16:24:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/26/2019) (wxc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frederick Braggs (wxc) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/27/2019) (wxc).
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Prisoner's Civil Rights ) against Lisa Mullen, Tamla Ray, John R. Smith, Sharen Wilson filed by Frederick Braggs. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braggs v. Ray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick Braggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamla Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?