Scott v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dara Scott
Defendant: British Airways PLC and American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00688
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21. Wed Oct 30 12:12:56 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ijeoma Ihuaku Opara. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/28/2019) (wxc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ijeoma Ihuaku Opara (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Dara Scott (wxc)
October 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:19. Fri Oct 25 16:55:22 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE... The court further ORDERS that a deadline of 4:00p.m. on October 31, 2019 be, and is hereby, set for Opara to file properly signed paper copies of the application for admission pro hac vice in accordance with the standing order. Failure to file such application by the deadline may result in the court not considering the application. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/25/2019) (wxc)
October 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17,18. Fri Oct 25 16:42:10 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Unfiling due to the following deficiency... All documents should be filed in traditional paper form, bearing the ORIGINAL signature of the filer. See Standing Order, filed September 3, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/25/2019) (wxc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Unfiling due to the following deficiency... All documents should be filed in traditional paper form, bearing the ORIGINAL signature of the filer. See Standing Order, filed September 3, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/25/2019) (wxc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #17 *** Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ijeoma Ihuaku Opara (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Dara Scott (wxc) Modified on 10/25/2019 (wxc).
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #18 *** Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10354168) filed by Dara Scott (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 /certificate of good standing). Party Ijeoma Ihuaku Opara added.Attorney Ijeoma Ihuaku Opara added to party Dara Scott(pty:pla) (Opara, Ijeoma) Modified on 10/25/2019 (wxc).
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against American Airlines, Inc., British Airways PLC filed by Dara Scott. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)
October 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Fri Oct 11 09:23:02 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 ... The court ORDERS that such motion be, and is hereby, granted. The court further ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on October 24, 2019, plaintiff file an appropriate written designation of local counsel and plaintiff's attorneys take the necessary steps to be admitted to practice in this court pursuant either Local Civil Rule LR 83.7 or LR 83.9. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/10/2019) (wxc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Dara Scott (wxc)
October 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Fri Oct 4 16:45:29 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER... The court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on October 23, 2019, plaintiff file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiff's Amended Complaint" in compliance with the pleading requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure' and the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the judge-specific requirements of the undersigned, and that by 4:00p.m. on November 6, 2019, defendants file an answer or other response to such Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/4/2019) (wxc)
September 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Wed Sep 25 11:13:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER... The court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on October 9, 2019, plaintiff file an appropriate written designation of local counsel and plaintiff's attorneys take the necessary steps to be admitted to practice in this court pursuant either Local Civil Rule LR 83.7 or LR 83.9. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/25/2019) (wxc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Appendix in Support of Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12 (b)(6) filed by American Airlines, Inc., British Airways PLC re #8 (wxc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by American Airlines, Inc., British Airways PLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (wxc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by American Airlines, Inc., British Airways PLC (wxc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Consent to Removal filed by American Airlines, Inc., British Airways PLC (wxc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons by American Airlines, Inc., British Airways PLC. (wxc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of document #1 received. (wxc)
September 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Tue Sep 3 10:33:03 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/3/2019) (wxc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 236th Judicial District, Tarrant County, case number 236-308073-19 filed by American Airlines, Inc., British Airways PLC d/b/a Iberia Airlines. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10234032) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Garrett, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways PLC
Represented By: Brian Keith Garrett
Represented By: Shauna J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Keith Garrett
Represented By: Shauna J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dara Scott
Represented By: Brennen Dunn
Represented By: Sasha C. Missick
Represented By: Sasha C Missick
Represented By: Ijeoma Ihuaku Opara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?