Gonzalez v. Mercado et al
Plaintiff: Mario Gonzalez
Defendant: United States, Federal Medical Center and Sergio Mercado
Case Number: 4:2019cv00694
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 USMS Process Receipt and Return as to U.S. Attorney General ; served via cert. mail on 10/10/2019. (edm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 USMS Process Receipt and Return as to Federal Medical Center; served on 10/16/2019 (edm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 USMS Receipt and Return as to Sergio Mercado ; served on 10/16/2019. (edm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sergio Mercado ; US Attorney's Office served on 10/3/2019. (npk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Federal Medical Center ; US Attorney's Office served on 10/3/2019. (npk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States ; US Attorney's Office served on 10/3/2019. (npk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Summons issued as to Federal Medical Center, Sergio Mercado, United States, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Summons with #1 Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint, and USM-285 provided to USMS per #9 Order) (bdb)
September 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Mon Sep 30 12:00:00 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court ORDERS that the clerk complete appropriate and sufficient summons forms to facilitate service of the summons and complaint on defendants. The court further ORDERS that, upon receipt of such papers from the clerk, the United States Marshal for the Northern District of Texas cause service of summonses to be made in the manner contemplated by the rule set forth above. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/30/2019) (bdb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Medical Center, Sergio Mercado, United States filed by Mario Gonzalez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (edm)
September 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. cy to Gonzalez Thu Sep 5 14:43:41 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By 4pm Sept 19 2019, plaintiff file an amended complaint stating with particularity all the material facts on which he contends he will establish his right to recover against each defendant. Failure to comply with this order in any respect may lead to the dismissal of plaintiff's claims for want of prosecution. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/5/2019) (wrb)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order For Partial Filing Fee in amount of $55.23 when funds exist in plaintiff's inmate trust account with a balance of $294.77 remaining. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/4/2019) (edm)
September 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4,5. Wed Sep 4 08:25:32 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/3/2019) (edm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (edm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Mario Gonzalez (edm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Sergio Mercado, Federal Medical Center, United States filed by Sergio Mercado. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (edm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Mercado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?