O'Laughlin v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Timothy O'Laughlin
Defendant: Esther Maria Corrigan, John Dean Sauer, Ashley Frazer and Robert Johnson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00701
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 Untitled Pleading written on DOJ letter filed by Timothy O'Laughlin. (wrb)
September 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Wed Sep 11 15:10:33 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the court's order signed this date, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims asserted by plaintiff, Timothy O'Laughlin, against all defendants, including Robert Johnson, Esther Maria Corrigan, and AUSA John Dean Sauer, be, and are hereby, dismissed pursuant to the authority of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) (2). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/11/2019) (tln)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The court ORDERS that plaintiff's claims in this action be, and are hereby, dismissed pursuant to the authority of 28 U.S.C. 1915 (e) (2). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/11/2019) (tln)
September 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. cy to O'Laughlin Tue Sep 10 16:19:54 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/10/2019) (wrb)
September 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. cy to O'Laughlin Tue Sep 10 16:15:42 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The undersigned judge, having taken senior status, desires to have this case reassigned to an active status judge. Case reassigned to Senior Judge John McBryde for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Terry R Means no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/10/2019) (wrb)
September 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. cy to petitioner Thu Sep 5 11:57:22 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: IFP ruled on provisionally in transferring court. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:19-cv-00631. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
September 5, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Texas. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/5/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas for all further proceedings. Signed on August 29, 2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/5/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Timothy O'Laughlin. (Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/5/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy O'Laughlin. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Laughlin v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Maria Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dean Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?