v. Ford Motor Credit
Plaintiff: Paul Stiggers, III
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit
Case Number: 4:2019cv00709
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Stiggers, III. (tln)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Credit. (Shah, Dimple)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ford Motor Credit ; served on 10/28/2019. (wxc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Paul Stiggers, III re: #9 Motion to Dismiss. (tln)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ford Motor Credit re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Shah, Dimple)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () filed by Ford Motor Credit with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Dimple Desai Shah added to party Ford Motor Credit(pty:dft) (Shah, Dimple)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties by Paul Stiggers, III. (wxc)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Summary Judgment as Premature. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/18/2019) (tln)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support filed by Paul Stiggers, III re #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (tln)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Stiggers, III. (tln)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (tln)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Credit. (tln)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ford Motor Credit filed by Paul Stiggers, III. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number FW033287) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Ford Motor Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Stiggers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit
Represented By: Dimple Desai Shah
Represented By: Kelly R Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?