Smith et al v. JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Nikole M. Smith and Shawn D. Smith
Defendant: JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00751
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Nikole M. Smith, Shawn D. Smith re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Brinkley, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nikole M. Smith, Shawn D. Smith (Brinkley, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Response by plaintiffs now due by 11/4/2019. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/23/2019) (wrb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nikole M. Smith, Shawn D. Smith (Brinkley, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 11/2/2020 before Judge Mark Pittman. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/6/2020. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Motions due by 6/19/2020. Initial Expert Designation and Report due by 12/4/19. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/21/2019) (wrb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC. (Hytken, Rachel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Appendix in Support filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC re #6 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Hytken, Rachel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Hytken, Rachel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC (Hytken, Rachel)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER...Lead counsel for each party shall confer no later than Oct 7 2019; Joint Report due by 10/21/2019. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/24/2019) (wrb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC. (Hytken, Rachel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 67th District Court, Tarrant Co., TX, case number 067-309671-19 filed by JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10279110) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s)) (Lewis, Wm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikole M. Smith
Represented By: Michael Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn D. Smith
Represented By: Michael Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMC Specialty Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Rachel Lee Hytken
Represented By: Wm Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?