Rose v. WL Benefits Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norma J Rose
Defendant: Cook Children's Health Care System, WL Benefits Group, Inc. and Paul J Burt
Case Number: 4:2019cv00801
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Cook Children's Health Care System. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Norma J Rose. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The court ORDERS that by November 18, 2019, plaintiff file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiff's Amended Complaint".... By December 2, 2019, defendants shall file an answer or other response to such Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2019. Paul J Burt Answer due 12/2/2019; Cook Children's Health Care System 12/2/2019; WL Benefits Group, Inc. 12/2/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 11/5/2019) (npk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by Cook Children's Health Care System. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)
October 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Thu Oct 10 11:02:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OFTIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #8 ... Before the Court is Defendant Cook Children's Health Care System's ("Defendant")Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court finds the Motion is unopposed and has merit and, therefore, the Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including October 25, 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/9/2019) (wxc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cook Children's Health Care System (wrb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Received originals and judge's copies of case initiating documents pursuant to Standing Order re: #3 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal #2 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Cook Children's Health Care System (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (wrb)
October 7, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. cy to Murrell Mon Oct 7 11:10:13 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/4/2019) (wrb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cook Children's Health Care System. (Mathisen, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of Cook Children's Health Care System. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mathisen, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from Tarrant County District Court, case number 236-310694-19 filed by Cook Children's Health Care System. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10315541) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Index of Pleadings Filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit(s) A, Tarrant County District Court Record, #3 Exhibit(s) B, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in the state court matter, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Mathisen, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. WL Benefits Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Children's Health Care System
Represented By: Eric P Mathisen
Represented By: James Thomas McBride
Represented By: Jana S Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WL Benefits Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma J Rose
Represented By: James M Murrell
Represented By: James Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?