Sarabian v. Halliburton Logging Services
Plaintiff: Ray Sarabian
Defendant: Halliburton Logging Services, Inc, Halliburton Energy Services and Halliburton Logging Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv00954
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Thu Jan 2 15:28:41 CST 2020 (crt)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Before the court for consideration is the #12 motion of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc, improperly named in this action as Halliburton Logging Services, ("Halliburton") seeking an extension of time for one of its attorneys, James Barnish, to obtain admission to this court. Having considered the motion, the court finds that it should be granted. Therefore, the court ORDERS that Halliburton's counsel, James Barnish be, and is here, granted an extension until January 10, 2020, to obtain admission to this Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/2/2020) (tln)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME filed by Halliburton Logging Services. (tln)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Halliburton Logging Services filed by Ray Sarabian. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)
December 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Mon Dec 23 14:22:00 CST 2019 (crt)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 ... The court ORDERS that Halliburton's counsel, James Barnish be, and is here, granted an extension until January 3, 2020, to obtain admission to this Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 12/23/2019) (wxc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time (for atty Barnish to obtain admission) filed by Halliburton Logging Services (wrb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 Designation of Local Counsel by David E Finck on behalf of Halliburton Logging Services. (wxc)
December 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Dec 16 14:33:44 CST 2019 (crt)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER... The court ORDERS that by December 30, 2019, plaintiff file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiff's Amended Complaint". (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 12/16/2019) (wxc)
December 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Dec 13 10:10:36 CST 2019 (crt)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER... The court ORDERS that by December 26, 2019, defendant's attorneys file a written designation of local counsel. The court further ORDERS that Barnish be, and is hereby, given until December 26, 2019 to take the necessary steps to be admitted to practice in this court pursuant to either Local Civil Rule LR 83.7 or LR 83.9. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 12/12/2019) (wxc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy pursuant to standing order re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Halliburton Logging Services. (tln)
November 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3, 4. Thu Nov 14 08:22:36 CST 2019 (crt)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 11/13/2019) (bdb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 348th; Tarrant County, case number 348-311392-19 filed by Halliburton Logging Services, Inc, Halliburton Energy Services. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10404937) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Finck, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarabian v. Halliburton Logging Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Sarabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Logging Services, Inc
Represented By: David E Finck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services
Represented By: David E Finck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Logging Services
Represented By: David E Finck
Represented By: John S Polzer
Represented By: Katherine R Hancock
Represented By: James T Barnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?