McGee v. Ft Worth Police Dept et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius A. McGee
Defendant: Tarrant County Court @ Law, Richland Hills Police Dept and Ft Worth Police Dept
Case Number: 4:2019cv00957
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Fri Nov 15 14:40:04 CST 2019 (crt)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis granted per Order #6 . No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) Modified on 11/15/2019 (wxc).
November 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Nov 14 12:14:40 CST 2019 (crt)
November 13, 2019 New case number 4:19-cv-00957-O McGee v. Ft Worth Police Dept et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:19cv2610-X. Future filings should be made in the FORT WORTH division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/13/2019) (axm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONS or take any further action pending judicial screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/12/2019) (axm)
November 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Nov 5 09:55:03 CST 2019 (crt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Demetrius A. McGee. (cdt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Demetrius A. McGee. (cdt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ft Worth Police Dept, Richland Hills Police Dept, Tarrant County Court @ Law filed by Demetrius A. McGee. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cdt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cdt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Ft Worth Police Dept et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarrant County Court @ Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Hills Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ft Worth Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius A. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?