Tango Marine S.A. v. Elephant Group Limited et al
Plaintiff: Tango Marine S.A.
Defendant: Elephant Group PLC and Elephant Group Limited
Garnishee: Shine Bridge Global Incorporated, Heritage Agro-Allied Foods, Inc. and Heritage Agro-Allied (H2A) Foods Nigeria Limted
Case Number: 4:2020cv00042
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Referring Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry Caldwell (wrb)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: by 4pm Feb 10 2020, plaintiff file a return of service as to H2A that states that the process of maritime attachment and garnishment, the verified complaint, and the January 21, 2020 order were all served on H2A by Wiehle or a person appointed by him who is at least 18 years old and not a party to this action. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/3/2020) (wrb)
January 31, 2020 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed on 1/23/20 as to Heritage Agro-Allied (H2A) Foods Nigeria Limted re: #19 Writ Issued. (wrb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Standing Order filed by Tango Marine S.A. (wrb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Heritage Agro-Allied (H2A) Foods Nigeria Limited. (wrb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 18 Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Shine Bridge Global Incorporated. (wrb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Heritage Agro-Allied Foods Inc. (wrb)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #3 Motion ; granting #5 Motion...Clerk authorized to issue such process against all tangible and intangible property of defendants in the custody, possession or control of garnishees in the amount of $1,250,000.00 as security for plaintiff's claims against defendants. The motion for appointment for service granted and Scott R. Wiehle, or any person appointed by him who is at least 18 yrs old and not a party to this action, is appointed to serve the process of maritime attachment and garnishment, along with copies of the verified complaint and this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/21/2020) (wrb)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Received Original and Judge's Copies of Case Initiating Documents pursuant to Standing Order re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint,,,,, #4 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 MOTION Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment, #5 MOTION Appointment for Serivce of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment filed by Tango Marine S.A. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s)) (wrb)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J Stephen Simms. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/17/2020) (wrb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/16/2020) (bdb)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT:The undersigned judge, having taken senior status, desires to have this case re-assigned to an active-status judge. The clerk of the Court is therefore DIRECTED to re-assign this case by random draw to another judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/16/2020) (bdb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Elephant Group Limited, Elephant Group PLC. (wrb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney J Stephen Sims (Filing fee $100; Receipt number FW033965) filed by Tango Marine S.A. Attorney J Stephen Simms added to party Tango Marine S.A.(pty:pla) (wrb)
January 16, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. cy to Steppick Thu Jan 16 14:00:47 CST 2020 (crt)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Tango Marine S.A.. (Wiehle, Scott)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Tango Marine S.A.. (Wiehle, Scott)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Appointment for Serivce of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment filed by Tango Marine S.A. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiehle, Scott)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Tango Marine S.A. re #3 MOTION Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment (Wiehle, Scott)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment filed by Tango Marine S.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s)) (Wiehle, Scott)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tango Marine S.A.. (Wiehle, Scott)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elephant Group Limited, Elephant Group PLC, Heritage Agro-Allied (H2A) Foods Nigeria Limted, Heritage Agro-Allied Foods, Inc., Shine Bridge Global Incorporated filed by Tango Marine S.A.. ((Filing Fee $400 paid Receipt No. 053910549212)) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Wiehle, Scott) Modified on 1/16/2020 (wrb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tango Marine S.A. v. Elephant Group Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tango Marine S.A.
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Represented By: Scott R Wiehle
Represented By: Emily Raye Steppick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elephant Group PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elephant Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Shine Bridge Global Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Heritage Agro-Allied Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Heritage Agro-Allied (H2A) Foods Nigeria Limted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?