Rogers v. Davis
Plaintiff: Ralph W. Doc. Rogers
Defendant: Warden Lorie Davis
Case Number: 4:2020cv00090
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10,11. Tue Feb 4 13:44:30 CST 2020 (crt)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (tln)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) File to: staff attorney PW. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-05044. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
February 4, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 2/4/2020, filed. (sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division; TERMINATED (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel( Motion Docket Date 2/21/2020.) by Ralph W. Doc. Rogers, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Ralph Rogers, Sr. re: case status, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ralph W. Doc. Rogers, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ralph W. Doc. Rogers, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/21/2020. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Letter MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Ralph W. Doc. Rogers, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/21/2020. (EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Ralph W. Doc. Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Denial of Constitutional Rights, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph W. Doc. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?