McDermott v. Salem Media Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew McDermott
Defendant: Salem Media Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00097
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 Report to Copyright Office of Final Order. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (wxc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Aten Lamberson for Michael E. Coles on behalf of Matthew McDermott. (Lamberson, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL JUDGMENT... This Judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). The Court issued its order dismissing this case for failure to comply with a court order. See ECF No. 8. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/11/2020) (wxc)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER... The Court ordered Plaintiff Matthew McDermott to comply with Local Rule 83.10 within fourteen days of the February 25, 2020 Order (ECF No. 8). A review of the record reveals that McDermott is still not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Because McDermott has failed to follow the Local Rules of the Northern District and has failed to follow a court order, the Court ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedre. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/11/2020) (wxc)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER... A review of the record reveals that Plaintiff Matthew McDermott is not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Accordingly, within fourteen days of this order, Plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions and/or the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/25/2020) (wxc)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 ... Before the Court is Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 6). Having considered the unopposed motion the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant is ORDERED to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before March 12, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/25/2020) (wxc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Salem Media Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sean M Whyte added to party Salem Media Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Whyte, Sean)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Salem Media Group, Inc.. (wxc)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (wxc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/6/2020) (wxc).
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Matthew McDermott. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Salem Media Group, Inc. filed by Matthew McDermott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10599279) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermott v. Salem Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew McDermott
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Represented By: Elizabeth Aten Lamberson
Represented By: Michael E Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?