Nguyen v. Nguyen et al
Case Number: 4:2020cv00120
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Fort Worth Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:36,37. Thu Feb 13 10:41:58 CST 2020 (crt)
February 13, 2020 Filing 37 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (tln)
February 13, 2020 Filing 36 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
February 13, 2020 Filing 35 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02229. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
February 12, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 2/12/2020, filed. (jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting in Party and Denying in Part #6 Motion to Consolidate and/or to Transfer. ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER #24 MOTION to Dismiss is granted; #32 MOTION Nonrecognition and nondeference of alleged vietnamese judgments is denied without prejudice; Plaintiff's #21 #22 #23 requests for entry of default as to Defendants Ngo Thi Ngoan, Hein The Ta, and Lai Xuan Ta are denied as moot.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Nonrecognition and Nondeference of Alleged Vietnamese Judgments with brief in support by Khue Nguyen, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/7/2020. (JenniferOlson, 4) Modified on 12/19/2019 (JenniferOlson, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 31 SUR REPLY AND NOTICE OF VIETNAM LAW PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 44.1 to #29 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Khue Nguyen. (SandraSilva, 7) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion for substituted service of process by Khue Nguyen; denying as moot #18 Motion for Substituted Service of Process and Affidavit by Khue Nguyen.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Ngo Thi Ngoan. (Kersey, Maureen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT to #27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Khue Nguyen, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to #24 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Khue Nguyen. (jtabares, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Khue Nguyen, filed.(jtabares, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF In Support re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss by Ngo Thi Ngoan, Hien The Ta, Lai Xuan Ta, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment Lower Ct, #2 Exhibit Judgment Upper Ct)(Kersey, Maureen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Ngo Thi Ngoan, Hien The Ta, Lai Xuan Ta, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2019. (Kersey, Maureen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Lai Xuan Ta by Khue Nguyen, filed.(mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Hien The Ta by Khue Nguyen, filed.(mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Ngo Thi Ngoan by Khue Nguyen, filed.(mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Supplemental Proposed Order re: #14 MOTION for Substituted Service of Process and Affidavit, #18 MOTION for Substituted Service of Process and Affidavit by Khue Nguyen, filed. (dflores, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Anh Kim Nguyen, Mai Tuyet Nguyen, Que Dang Nguyen, Hoa Thi Ta Le, filed.(Kersey, Maureen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Substituted Service of Process and Affidavit by Khue Nguyen, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits)(LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Khue Nguyen. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Khue Nguyen.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Mai Tuyet Nguyen re: Complaint, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Hoa Thi Ta Le re: Complaint, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for substituted service of process by Khue Nguyen, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Receipts)(hcarr, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hien The Ta served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lai Xuan Ta served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ngo Thi Ngoan served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hai Phu Nguyen, filed.(Kersey, Maureen) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Anh Kim Nguyen re: Summons, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Que Dang Nguyen re: Summons, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Maureen S. Kersey to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:18cv801-A and Member Case No. 4:19-CV-2229( Motion Docket Date 8/28/2019.), MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas/ Fort Worth Division by Hai Phu Nguyen, filed. (nortiz, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (nortiz, 5). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Maureen S. Kersey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hai Phu Nguyen, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2019. (LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to Hai Phu Nguyen on 7/16/19 re: FORM USM-285, filed.(nortiz, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Court Order of Process by United States Marshals by Khue Nguyen, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285)(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Ngo Thi Ngoan, Anh Kim Nguyen, Hai Phu Nguyen, Khue Nguyen, Mai Tuyet Nguyen, Que Dang Nguyen, Hien The Ta, Lai Xuan Ta, Hoa Thi Ta Le. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU089386, filed. (gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 to 5, Ngo Thi Ngoan, Anh Kim Nguyen, Hai Phu Nguyen, Mai Tuyet Nguyen, Que Dang Nguyen, Hien The Ta, Lai Xuan Ta, Hoa Thi Ta Le filed by Khue Nguyen. (gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Nguyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?