Five Oaks Achievement Center, LLC v. Camp Worth, LLC
Plaintiff: Five Oaks Achievement Center, LLC
Defendant: Camp Worth, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00179
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff Five Oaks Achievement Center, LLC's Motion to Reinstate and Designate Local Counsel. ECF No. #8 . Having considered the Motion, the Court finds that it should be and is hereby DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/13/2020) (tln)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Reopen Case and Designation of Local Counsel filed by Five Oaks Achievement Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Carroll, Frank)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Report to Copyright Office of Final Order. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (tln)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT: This Final Judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all costs and expenses are taxed against the party incurring the same. The Clerk shall transmit a true copy of this Final Judgment to the parties. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/12/2020) (tln)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff Five Oaks Achievement Center, LLC was notified on February 26, 2020, to comply with Local Rule 83.10 within fourteen days. (ECF No. 2). A review of the record reveals that Plaintiff is still not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Because Plaintiff has failed to follow the Local Rules of the Northern District, the Court ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All pending motions in this matter are hereby DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/12/2020) (tln)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (bdb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Camp Worth, LLC. (bdb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Camp Worth, LLC filed by Five Oaks Achievement Center, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10655713) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Carroll, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Five Oaks Achievement Center, LLC v. Camp Worth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Worth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Five Oaks Achievement Center, LLC
Represented By: Frank O Carroll, III
Represented By: Clayton R Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?