Galderma Laboratories, L.P. v. Arrow Pharmacy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Galderma Laboratories, L.P. and Galderma Laboratories LP
Defendant: Nirmal Patel and Arrow Pharmacy Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00215
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric L Scott on behalf of Nirmal Patel. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Scott, Eric)
May 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric L Scott on behalf of Arrow Pharmacy Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Scott, Eric)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Galderma Laboratories LP. Waiver sent on 4/9/2020. (Parker, Schyler)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER... The court concludes that this action should be transferred to the docket of the Honorable Mark T. Pittman for future handling, including possible consolidation with one or more actions pending on his docket. Therefore, The court ORDERS that the above-captioned action be, and is hereby, transferred to the docket of the Honorable Mark T. Pittman. Case reassigned to Judge Mark Pittman for all further proceedings. Senior Judge John McBryde no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/27/2020) (wxc)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Partial Suspension of Standing Order of 1/15/19 - The directive in paragraph 1 requiring that no document be filed by electronic means, and the directive in paragraph 2 requiring that paper copies of electronically filed documents be delivered to the clerk for filing, are suspended until 5/1/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/19/2020) (Order has been served on registered users of the ECF system)(lrl)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Arrow Pharmacy Inc., Nirmal Patel. (wxc)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Galderma Laboratories, L.P. (tln)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arrow Pharmacy Inc., Nirmal Patel filed by Galderma Laboratories, L.P. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER... The court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on March 16, 2020, plaintiff file an amended complaint that provides (I) the citizenship of each of plaintiff's partners, (II) the states of Arrow's incorporation and location of its principal place of business, and (III) the state in which Patel is domiciled. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions, including the dismissal of plaintiff's claims and causes of action. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/10/2020) (wxc)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Galderma Laboratories, L.P. (tln)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Complaint, filed by Galderma Laboratories, L.P. (tln)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Arrow Pharmacy Inc., Nirmal Patel. (tln)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/5/2020) (tln)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Galderma Laboratories, L.P.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10679121) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Drez, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galderma Laboratories, L.P. v. Arrow Pharmacy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirmal Patel
Represented By: Eric L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Eric L Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galderma Laboratories, L.P.
Represented By: Schyler Paige Parker
Represented By: David J Drez, III
Represented By: Lauren Kessler Drawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galderma Laboratories LP
Represented By: Schyler Paige Parker
Represented By: David J Drez, III
Represented By: Lauren Kessler Drawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?