Hall v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Herman Lee Hall
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID and Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2020cv00655
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TDCJ-CID Director. (Todd, Patrick)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Daniel Todd on behalf of TDCJ-CID Director. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Todd, Patrick)
July 14, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Jul 14 12:31:19 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Electronic Service by TDCJ-CID Director. (wxc)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. Deadline to reply to the answer is 30 days. (Documents emailed to Edward Marshall and Laura Haney) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/13/2020) (wxc) (Modified docket text )
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Herman Lee Hall (npk)
July 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. withfIFP form Thu Jul 2 08:20:26 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Herman Lee Hall must address the following deficiency: $5.00 filing fee has not been paid nor has an application to proceed in forma pauperis and certificate of inmate trust account be submitted.. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/1/2020) (wxc)
June 25, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. cy to Hall Thu Jun 25 08:37:33 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney PW. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28 USC 2254 filed by Herman Lee Hall. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herman Lee Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?