Woodards v. Amazon et al
Plaintiff: Tre'von A. Woodards
Defendant: Amazon and AEP
Case Number: 4:2020cv00736
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Aug 27 09:29:55 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tre'von A. Woodards. Based on the relevant filings and applicable legal authorities, the Application should be DENIED, and the case should be dismissed for failure to follow court orders unless the Plaintiff timely pays the filing fee. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/27/2020) (skg)
July 21, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Jul 21 12:08:17 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must pay to the clerk of Court the full filing fee of $400.00 by August 20, 2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/21/2020) (skg)
July 20, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Mon Jul 20 14:06:36 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tre'von A. Woodards (npk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEP, Amazon filed by Tre'von A. Woodards. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (npk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodards v. Amazon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tre'von A. Woodards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?