XTO Energy Inc v. Frontier Drilling, LLC et al
Plaintiff: XTO Energy Inc
Defendant: Rigup, Inc, Johnny Noel Macon, Jr., Rusco Operating, LLC, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Cody Kirkpatrick, Frontier Drilling, LLC, Great Northern Insurance Company and Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00775
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Appendix in Support filed by Great Northern Insurance Company re #30 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Ave, Gregory)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Great Northern Insurance Company re #29 Response/Objection (Ave, Gregory)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by Great Northern Insurance Company re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Ave, Gregory)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Hupf on behalf of Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Johnny Noel Macon, Jr., Rigup, Inc, Rusco Operating, LLC, Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hupf, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Appendix in Support filed by XTO Energy Inc re #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #26 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Sims, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by XTO Energy Inc re #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Sims, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by XTO Energy Inc (Sims, Andrew)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Frontier Drilling, LLC. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,,, Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Kayla Chudej Miller added to party Frontier Drilling, LLC(pty:crd) (Miller, Kayla)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Frontier Drilling, LLC. Related document: #6 Answer to Complaint,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,, Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Kayla Chudej Miller added to party Frontier Drilling, LLC(pty:crd) (Miller, Kayla)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Related document: #6 Answer to Complaint,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,, Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Ave, Gregory)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,,, Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Ave, Gregory)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by XTO Energy Inc. (Sims, Andrew)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/13/2020) (tln)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frontier Drilling, LLC. (Bambace, Peter)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Johnny Noel Macon, Jr., Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orlando, Michael)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: A review of the record reveals that Defendants Rusco Operating, LLC; Rigup, Inc.; Cody Kirkpatrick; Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc.; Johnny Noel Macon, Jr.; and Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC are not in compliance with Local Rule 83.10(a). Accordingly, on or before August 26, 2020, Defendants shall file the entries of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/12/2020) (npk)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by XTO Energy Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Corporation for XTO Energy Inc. (Sims, Andrew)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Joseph Bambace for Charles B. Holm on behalf of Frontier Drilling, LLC. (Bambace, Peter)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Mail returned as undeliverable. #9 Status Report Order, received back from Peter Joseph Bambace Attorney at Law as Return to Sender - Unable to Forward - Unable to Forward - Return to Sender. (Clerk note: notice of #9 Status Report Order electronically regenerated to Peter Joseph Bambace on 08/11/2020) (pef)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Frontier Drilling, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Kayla Chudej Miller added to party Frontier Drilling, LLC(pty:dft) (Miller, Kayla)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Mail returned as undeliverable re #5 New Case Notes, received back from Peter Joseph Bambace as Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (tln)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Ave, Gregory)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCEAND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER..Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer (the Scheduling Conference) in a face-to-face conference as soon as practicable.Joint Report due by 8/13/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/30/2020) (wrb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. cy to Bambace Thu Jul 30 10:10:14 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rusco Operating, LLC, Rigup, Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., First CROSSCLAIM against Frontier Drilling, LLC, Great Northern Insurance Company filed by Rusco Operating, LLC, Rigup, IncAttorney Jeffrey Bentch added to party Rigup, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Bentch added to party Rusco Operating, LLC(pty:dft) (Bentch, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Johnny Noel Macon, Jr., Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC. (Orlando, Michael)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC, Johnny Noel Macon, Jr.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., CROSSCLAIM against Frontier Drilling, LLC, Great Northern Insurance Company filed by Cody Kirkpatrick, Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc., Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC, Johnny Noel Macon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6)Attorney Michael Alan Orlando, Jr added to party Cody Kirkpatrick(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Alan Orlando, Jr added to party Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Alan Orlando, Jr added to party Johnny Noel Macon, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Alan Orlando, Jr added to party Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC(pty:dft) (Orlando, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Jul 27 08:09:45 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Reed C. O'Connor recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Mark Pittman for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:20-cv-775-P. (bdb)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Frontier Drilling, LLC (Ave, Gregory)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Ave, Gregory)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11023795) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F) (Ave, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XTO Energy Inc v. Frontier Drilling, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigup, Inc
Represented By: Michael Hupf
Represented By: Jeffrey Bentch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Noel Macon, Jr.
Represented By: Arturo Cuauhtemoc Aguilar
Represented By: Michael Alan Orlando, Jr
Represented By: Michael Hupf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusco Operating, LLC
Represented By: Michael Hupf
Represented By: Jeffrey Bentch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkpatrick Oilfield Services, Inc.
Represented By: Arturo Cuauhtemoc Aguilar
Represented By: Michael Alan Orlando, Jr
Represented By: Michael Hupf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Arturo Cuauhtemoc Aguilar
Represented By: Michael Alan Orlando, Jr
Represented By: Michael Hupf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Drilling, LLC
Represented By: Peter Joseph Bambace
Represented By: Charles B Holm
Represented By: Kayla Chudej Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Richardson Ave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texoma Safety Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Arturo Cuauhtemoc Aguilar
Represented By: Michael Alan Orlando, Jr
Represented By: Michael Hupf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XTO Energy Inc
Represented By: Caroline Marie Cyrier
Represented By: Andrew D Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?