The Hanover Insurance Company v. Bank OZK
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Leigh Anne Mahone, Kodiak Trenching and Boring LLC, Kodiak Excavation and Utilities LLC, Oryx Oilfield Services LLC, Kodiak Testing LLC, Kodiak Rental and Supply LLC, Oryx Oilfield Holdings LLC and Matthew J Mahone
Counter Claimant: Bank OZK
Case Number: 4:2020cv00832
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Judgment... ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Hanover Insurance Company against Bank OZK in the amount of $510.07; ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Bank OZK shall deliver to The Hanover Insurance Company a check in the amount of $510.07 within thirty (30) days of the entry of this judgment; ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Bank OZK is awarded recovery of its costs and expenses, including reasonable attorneys fees in the total amount of $500.00, from the sums in its possession belonging to Judgment Debtors; ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this Order fully and finally resolves allof Bank OZKs liability the Plaintiff and Judgment Debtors to the extent of the sums above orders; and ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that any other costs of court are assessed against the party incurring said costs. All relief not expressly granted is denied. This Order disposes of all claims and all parties. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/22/2020) (wrb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Garnishee's Answer to Writ of Garnishment and Original Counterclaim [Dkt 6] by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Judgment Motion for Entry of Agreed Judgment filed by The Hanover Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Judgment) (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for The Hanover Insurance Company's Application for Writ of Garnishment with Exhibits A & B [Dkt #1], and Writ of Garnishment [Dkt #5] served on Matthew J Mahone on 09/01/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for The Hanover Insurance Company's Application for Writ of Garnishment with Exhibits A & B [Dkt #1], and Writ of Garnishment [Dkt #5] served on Leigh Anne Mahone on 09/01/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for The Hanover Insurance Company's Application for Writ of Garnishment with Exhibits A & B [Dkt #1], and Writ of Garnishment [Dkt #5] served on Oryx Oilfield Services LLC on 08/26/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for The Hanover Insurance Company's Application for Writ of Garnishment with Exhibits A & B [Dkt #1], and Writ of Garnishment [Dkt #5] served on Oryx Oilfield Holdings LLC on 08/26/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for The Hanover Insurance Company's Application for Writ of Garnishment with Exhibits A & B [Dkt #1], and Writ of Garnishment [Dkt #5] served on Kodiak Trenching and Boring LLC on 08/26/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for The Hanover Insurance Company's Application for Writ of Garnishment with Exhibits A & B [Dkt #1], and Writ of Garnishment [Dkt #5] served on Kodiak Testing LLC on 08/26/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for The Hanover Insurance Company's Application for Writ of Garnishment with Exhibits A & B [Dkt #1], and Writ of Garnishment [Dkt #5] served on Kodiak Rental and Supply LLC on 08/26/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for The Hanover Insurance Company's Application for Writ of Garnishment with Exhibits A & B [Dkt #1], and Writ of Garnishment [Dkt #5] served on Kodiak Excavation and Utilities LLC on 08/26/2020. (Pemberton, Phillip)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Brent DeLaune for Ryan B. DeLaune on behalf of The Hanover Insurance Company. (DeLaune, Ryan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank OZK. (McKinney, Richard)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Bank OZK's ANSWER to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment,,,,, filed by Bank OZK. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Bank OZKAttorney Richard A McKinney added to party Bank OZK(pty:gar) (McKinney, Richard)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Writ of Garnishment reissued. (wrb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Revised Writ of Garnishment filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Pemberton, Phillip)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Bank OZK. (wrb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Hanover Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Opus Investment Management, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for The Hanover Insurance Company. (Pemberton, Phillip)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment against Bank OZK filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11061085) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Final Judgment, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Affidavit of Phillip W Pemberton, #3 Additional Page(s) Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit(s) Notice of Related Cases, #7 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Interested Persons) (Pemberton, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hanover Insurance Company v. Bank OZK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip Wayne Pemberton
Represented By: Christopher R Ward
Represented By: Ryan Brent DeLaune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Bank OZK
Represented By: Richard A McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Anne Mahone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodiak Trenching and Boring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodiak Excavation and Utilities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oryx Oilfield Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodiak Testing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodiak Rental and Supply LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oryx Oilfield Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J Mahone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?