Young v. Paxton
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Case Number: 4:2020cv00839
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for a speedy hearing under Rule 57 filed by Huguette Nicole Young (Young, Huguette)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION 1. To remove magistrate judge from the case; 2) have the DJ carry out a de novo review of plaintiff's Application to Proceed IFP; and 3) compel the court to honor Rule 5.1(b) of Fed. R. Civ. P. filed by Huguette Nicole Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Young v. Superior Court of California, unnumbered petition, #2 Exhibit(s) Number of Magistrate Judges in the US, #3 Exhibit(s) Dred Scott Fraud, Challenge of 16th Amendment) (Young, Huguette)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: After consideration of the pleadings and the applicable legal authorities, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that United States District Judge Mark T. Pittman DENY Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis and DISMISS the case WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 10/8/2020) (skg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION 1. To remove magistrate judge from the case; 2) have the DJ render an order on Application to Proceed IFP; and 3) compel the court to honor Rule 5.1(b) of Fed. R. Civ. P. filed by Huguette Nicole Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Young v. Superior Court of CA, Petition for Review, #2 Exhibit(s) Number of Magistrate Judges in the US, #3 Exhibit(s) Dred Scott Fraud, Challenge to 16th Amendment) (Young, Huguette)
August 13, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Aug 13 14:35:16 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that on or before September 14, 2020, Young shall either pay the full filing fee of $400 or file an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a completed affidavit. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/13/2020) (skg)
August 11, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Tue Aug 11 08:55:18 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (tln)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (tln)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (tln)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ken Paxton filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?