Rhodes v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Louise Rhodes
Defendant: United States Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Merit Systems Protection Board, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, United States Northern District Court, United States Representatives, United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit, United States of America, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Justice and United States Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00956
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. cy to Rhodes Mon Sep 21 13:38:19 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL JUDGMENT.. This Final Judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. In accordance with the order dismissing this case (ECF No. 9): It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/21/2020) (wrb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations re: #6 Public Correspondence Received, #7 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #1 Complaint,,, filed by Louise Rhodes. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/21/2020) (wrb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Mail returned as undeliverable. #7 Findings and Recommendations on Case received back from Louise Rhodes as attempted; not known--unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (npk)
September 3, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Sep 3 11:24:54 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The undersigned therefore RECOMMENDS that United States District Judge Mark T. Pittman direct the Clerk of Court to administratively close this case pursuant to Plaintiff's request. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 9/3/2020) (skg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Public correspondence received from Louise Rhodes. (npk)
August 26, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Aug 26 09:21:36 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Louise Rhodes must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff has failed to either pay the filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 9/25/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/26/2020) (skg)
August 25, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Tue Aug 25 16:49:59 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD--SEE #4 ***New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk) Modified on 8/25/2020 (npk).
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit, United States Department of Justice, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, United States Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Merit Systems Protection Board, United States Northern District Court, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States Representatives, United States Social Security Administration, United States of America filed by Louise Rhodes. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (npk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Merit Systems Protection Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Northern District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?