Daniels v. Infiniti Financial Services
Plaintiff: Amos M. Daniels
Defendant: Infiniti Financial Services
Case Number: 4:2020cv00976
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN. The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/22/2020) (npk)
October 22, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Oct 22 16:27:06 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Infiniti Financial Services identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Nissan North America, Inc. for Infiniti Financial Services. (Danner, R)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Infiniti Financial Services. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney R Dwayne Danner added to party Infiniti Financial Services(pty:dft) (Danner, R)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Infiniti Financial Services. (npk)
August 31, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Mon Aug 31 14:30:49 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Infiniti Financial Services filed by Amos M Daniels. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number FW034952) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (npk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Infiniti Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infiniti Financial Services
Represented By: R Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos M. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?