Alanazi v. Avco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Shaherh Fayez Alanazi
Defendant: Avco Corporation, Volare Carburetors, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC, Cashmere Molding, Inc., Precision Airmotive LLC, Forward Technologies Industries, Inc., Aero Accessories, Inc., Synergy Systems, Inc. and Marvel Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01079
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 86 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
October 1, 2020 Filing 85 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:19-cv-02230. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue; denying as moot #75 Motion to Dismiss; and directing the Clerk to close the file after transfer. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 10/1/2020. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 83 Joint MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Set deadlines: Joint Status Report regarding transfer of venue due by 10/5/2020. (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STATUS REPORT ORDER requiring filing of joint status report on or before October 5, 2020, regarding transfer of venue. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 9/28/2020. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 81 RESPONSE to Motion re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Reset deadlines as to #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint . Responses due by 9/15/2020 (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 9/9/2020. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 79 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to September 15, 2020, to File Response/Reply as to #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aziz, Muhammad) Modified on 9/9/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Set deadline as to #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Response due by 9/8/2020 (EJS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER directing the Clerk to terminate all Defendants except Avco Corporation in light of #74 Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/31/2020. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 8/28/2020. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 76 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aziz, Muhammad) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Avco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Justice, Petra) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 74 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Avco Corporation with Jury Demand. filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi.(Aziz, Muhammad) Modified on 8/4/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/1/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 72 Written designation and consent to act by John Douglas McKay on behalf of Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. Local Counsel: John D. McKay. Non-Resident Counsel: Muhammad S. Aziz and Karl P. Long. (McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Karl P. Long to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17003389 for $150 as co-counsel for Plaintiff by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Muhammad S. Aziz to appear pro hac vice Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17003356 for $150 as co-counsel for Plaintiff by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified to add receipt number on 7/2/2020 (MLJ). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Set deadlines: Second Amended Complaint due by 8/3/2020 (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting Plaintiff's request for leave to amend and for jurisdictional discovery; denying without prejudice #62 Motion to Dismiss, #63 Motion to Dismiss, and #64 Motion to Dismiss; and setting deadline of August 3, 2020, for the completion of jurisdictional discovery and the filing of a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/5/2020. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , #62 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint , #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 67 AVCO Corporation's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #59 Amended Complaint by Avco Corporation.(Justice, Petra) Modified on 2/26/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 02/19/2021 9:30 a.m. before Rodney Max.(McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file the Notice of Mediation within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/12/2020. (BRS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Dow, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Synergy Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bob Wysocki, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Bob Wysocki)(Garcia, Carlos) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Precision Airmotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Kaney, J.) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Set deadlines: for Avco Corporation. Answer due by 2/25/2020. (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENDORSED ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Avco Corporation shall file its response to the Amended Complaint (Doc. 59) on or before February 25, 2020. Avco is warned that since it is represented by three attorneys the schedule of one attorney will not be good cause for future requests for extensions of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/10/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 25, 2020, to File Response/Reply to #59 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Avco Corporation. (Justice, Petra) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 2/10/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 59 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi.(McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #45 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; no later than January 31, 2020, Plaintiff shall file her Amended Complaint as a separate document in the electronic record; denying without prejudice #43 motion to dismiss; denying without prejudice #12 Motion to dismiss; denying without prejudice #13 motion to dismiss; to the extent Defendants maintain that the deficiencies of the initial Complaint have not been cured in the Amended Complaint, Defendants may again move to dismiss after Plaintiff files her Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/28/2020. (BRS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 57 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Rodney Max appointed as Mediator. (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 3/6/2020, Discovery due by 4/9/2021, Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2021, Pretrial statement due by 8/30/2021, All other motions due by 8/16/2021, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge John Antoon II., Conduct mediation hearing by 4/23/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/29/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/11/2020 (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Dow, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Precision Airmotive, LLC. (Kaney, J.) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/27/2020. (BRS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 53 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dow, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER for W. Benjamin Pace and Justin S. Feinman to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/22/2020. (copies mailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 51 ENTERED IN ERROR (see Fee Payment entry dated 12/26/2019) - NOTICE to counsel W. Benjamin Pace and Justin S. Feinman of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (MAA) Modified on 1/28/2020 (MAA). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: the parties shall file the Case Management Report within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/15/2020. (BRS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss complaint (refiled to link to ECF No. 13 in light of Court's 1/14/2020 Order dismissing ECF No. 28 as duplicative) filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #28 Motion to Dismiss as duplicative. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/14/2020. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 45 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Appointment of PR, #2 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) Modified on 1/14/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #41 Order, #14 Interested persons order by Synergy Systems, Inc.. (Castro, Jennifer) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV (Breach of Warranty and Punitive Damages) of Plaintiff's Complaint by Avco Corporation. (Justice, Petra) Modified on 1/10/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 10, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorneys Francis S. Floyd, John A. Safarli, and William J. Dow, appearing on behalf of Forward Technologies Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $450.00 receipt number ORL088110.) Related document: #40 MOTION for Francis S. Floyd, John A. Safarli, and William J. Dow to appear pro hac vice. (KNC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Defendant Synergy Systems, Inc. shall file its Certificate of Interested Persons within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 1/3/2020. (BRS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Francis S. Floyd, John A. Safarli, and William J. Dow to appear pro hac vice by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Moberg, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 1/3/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 39 Written designation and consent to act by Patrick Ross Moberg on behalf of Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. Local Counsel: PATRICK ROSS MOBERG. Non-Resident Counsel: FRANCIS S. FLOYD, JOHN A. SAFARLI and WILLIAM J. DOW. (Moberg, Patrick) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Reset deadlines: for Avco Corporation. Answer due by 1/10/2020. (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying as moot #37 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to respond re #25 Motion to Dismiss filed by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi; denying without prejudice Avco Corporation's motion to dismiss [25 at 14-18]; and striking #25 Answer to Complaint filed by Avco Corporation. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/30/2019.(JAA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 26, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney W. Benjamin Pace and Justin S. Feinman, appearing on behalf of Aero Accessories, Inc., Marvel Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC, Precision Airmotive, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC, Volare Carburetors, LLC (Filing fee $300.00 receipt number ORL087740.) Related document: #34 MOTION for to appear pro hac vice. (KNC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to respond re #25 Motion to dismiss by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) Modified on 12/26/2019 (DMA). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/23/2019. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 35 Written designation and consent to act by J. Lester Kaney on behalf of Precision Airmotive, LLC. Local Counsel: J. Lester Kaney. Non-Resident Counsel: W. Benjamin Pace and Justin Feinman. (Kaney, J.) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 34 Corrected and Unopposed MOTION for W. Benjamin Pace and Justin Feinman to appear pro hac vice by Precision Airmotive, LLC. (Kaney, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 12/23/2019 (BIA). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Set deadlines as to #12 MOTION to dismiss , #13 MOTION to dismiss . Responses due by 1/13/2020 (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Responses to #12 motion to dismiss and #13 motion to dismiss are due January 13, 2020. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/19/2019. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to 01/13/2020 for response to motions to dismiss by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion does not comply with all the requirements of Local Rule 2.02(a) and does not comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/18/2019. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Ben Pace and Justin Feinman to appear pro hac vice by Precision Airmotive, LLC. (Kaney, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by J. Lester Kaney on behalf of Precision Airmotive, LLC, Volare Carburetors, LLC, Marvel-Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC, and Aero Accessories, LLC (Kaney, J.) Modified on 12/17/2019 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support by Precision Airmotive, LLC, Aero Accessories, LLC, Volare Carburetors, LLC, Marvel-Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC (Kaney, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified on 12/17/2019 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Avco Corporation. (Justice, Petra) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related case order by Avco Corporation. Related case(s): No (Justice, Petra) Modified on 12/17/2019 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 25 **STRICKEN per #38 Order** AVCO Corporation's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Counts I and II of Complaint with Jury Demand and Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Avco Corporation.(Justice, Petra) Modified on 12/17/2019 (SPM). Modified on 1/2/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED document by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. Amendment to #22 Declaration of John Herman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Declaration of John Herman)(Moberg, Patrick) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Michael R. Allen re #21 Amended document by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Moberg, Patrick) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 (Re-filed at #24 with corrected attachment) DECLARATION of John Herman re #21 Amended document by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Moberg, Patrick) Modified on 12/16/2019 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Moberg, Patrick) Modified on 12/16/2019 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. Related case(s): N (Moberg, Patrick) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.. (Moberg, Patrick) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. (McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related case order by Shaherh Fayez Alanazi. Related case(s): no (McKay, John) Modified on 12/9/2019 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John Douglas McKay on behalf of Shaherh Fayez Alanazi (McKay, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE to counsel W. Benjamin Pace and Justin Feinman of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copy mailed to counsel)(SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for DEFENDANTS PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC, VOLARE CARBURETORS, LLC, TEMPEST PLUS MARKETING GROUP, LLC, SYNERGY SYSTEMS, INC., and MARVEL SCHEBLER AIRCRAFT CARBURETORS, LLC. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/9/2019. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Marvel Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC, Precision Airmotive, LLC, Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC, Volare Carburetors, LLC. (Kaney, J.) Modified on 12/9/2019 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Synergy Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bob Wysocki)(Garcia, Carlos) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Forward Technologies Industries, Inc..(Moberg, Patrick) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Set deadlines: for Avco Corporation. Answer due by 12/16/2019. (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Defendant Avco Corporation. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/2/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant Avco Corporation shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/2/2019. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Avco Corporation. (Bourgeois, L.) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal, directing Defendant Forward Technologies Industries, Inc. to file an amended notice of removal no later than December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/26/2019. (EK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel John D. McKay of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk).(copy mailed) (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for John D. McKay to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/25/2019. (copy mailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Plaintiff and Defendant Forward Technologies Industries, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/25/2019. (counsel emailed/mailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/25/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2230-Orl-28LRH. (NAS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2019 31320 CICI filed in State Court on 07/15/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16178671 filed by Forward Technologies Industries, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moberg, Patrick) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 10/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alanazi v. Avco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avco Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick O'Flanagan
Represented By: Petra L. Justice
Represented By: L. Robert Bourgeois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volare Carburetors, LLC
Represented By: J. Lester Kaney
Represented By: William Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempest Plus Marketing Group, LLC
Represented By: J. Lester Kaney
Represented By: William Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashmere Molding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Airmotive LLC
Represented By: J. Lester Kaney
Represented By: William Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Technologies Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Francis S. Floyd
Represented By: John A. Safarli
Represented By: William J. Dow
Represented By: Patrick Ross Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Accessories, Inc.
Represented By: William Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Hara
Represented By: Jennifer Castro
Represented By: Carlos Antonio Garcia
Represented By: Christopher John Jahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Schebler Aircraft Carburetors, LLC
Represented By: J. Lester Kaney
Represented By: William Benjamin Pace
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaherh Fayez Alanazi
Represented By: Muhammad S. Aziz
Represented By: Karl P. Long
Represented By: John Douglas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?