McCalley v. Cousins et al
Plaintiff: Damaris Plaisant McCalley
Defendant: Nicole Bunn, The Attorney General of Texas, The Texas Medical Board, Stanley Thiebaud, Office for Civil Rights, Clifton Lyndell Cox, II, Scott Smith, Daniel Cousins, Melody Wilkinson, Zoom, David Evans, UT Southwestern and Southlake Police Dept
Case Number: 4:2020cv01134
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On October 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. was preliminary assigned to this case. See ECF No. #10 . As a result, this case was referred to Judge Ray. The Court finds it necessary to withdraw this referral. Accordingly, the Court hereby WITHDRAWS the referral. Additionally, the Plaintiff filed an emergency non-suit and notice of objection. This filing may properly be construed as a notice of non-suit. ECF No. #12 . This case is therefore DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/15/2020) (pef)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Damaris Plaisant McCalley must address the following deficiency: The Affidavit in Support of the Application on the first page of the Application is not signed or dated.. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 14 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 10/15/2020) (skg)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Emergency Non-Suit and NOTICE of Objection re: #9 Order Transferring to Another Division filed by Damaris Plaisant McCalley. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (pef)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (pef)
October 13, 2020 New case number 4:20-cv-1134-O; McCalley v. Cousins et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:20-cv-3039-G-BN. Future filings should be made in the FORT WORTH division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (cea)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/13/2020) (cea)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 Additional OBJECTION filed by Damaris Plaisant McCalley re: #5 Order Transferring to Another Division. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 VEHEMENT OBJECTION filed by Damaris Plaisant McCalley re: #5 Order Transferring to Another Division. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION filed by Damaris Plaisant McCalley re: #5 Order Transferring to Another Division. ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
October 7, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Oct 7 14:38:51 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. This action will therefore be transferred there under Section 1391(b) and the undersigned's authority granted by Rule 2(a)(3) of the Court's Miscellaneous Order No. 6 on 10/28/2020 to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Fish within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/7/2020) (axm)
October 5, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Oct 5 15:42:45 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Damaris Plaisant McCalley. (jmg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Nicole Bunn, Daniel Cousins, Clifton Lyndell Cox, III, David Evans, Office of Civil Rights, Scott Smith, Southlake Police Dept, The Attorney General of Texas, The Texas Medical Board, Stanley Thiebaud, UT Southwestern, Melody Wilkinson, Zoom filed by Damaris Plaisant McCalley. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCalley v. Cousins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Attorney General of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Texas Medical Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Thiebaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office for Civil Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Lyndell Cox, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UT Southwestern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southlake Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damaris Plaisant McCalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?