Little v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Paul La'Mark Little
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2020cv01182
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6, 7. Tue Oct 27 11:56:18 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney PW. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:20-cv-00341. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Affidavit re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Paul La'Mark Little. (Received in clerk's office before TXED completed transfer of case - held per staff attorney) (bdb)
June 29, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Texas Forth Worth Division. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/27/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRNASFER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Paul La'Mark Little. ORDERED that the petition is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/29/2020. (gsg) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/27/2020.]
June 24, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to petitioner. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul La'Mark Little. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Paul La'Mark Little. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope(s))(mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward L Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul La'Mark Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?