Montgomery v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Montgomery
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. doing business as Walmart #3773, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC and Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01209
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this date (ECF No. #7 ), the Court finds it appropriate to issue this Final Judgment. Therefore, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/23/2020) (tln)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. Accordingly, Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/23/2020) (tln)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Therefore, the Court ORDERS that: (1) on or before December 4, 2020, Plaintiff files an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the undersigneds judge-specific requirements; and, (2) on or before December 18, 2020, each defendant file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/23/2020) (tln)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Shawn Montgomery Attorney Chad Christopher Taylor added to party Shawn Montgomery(pty:pla) (Taylor, Chad)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (DePonte, Jennette)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit(s) Citation, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Return of Service, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Defendants' Answer) (DePonte, Jennette)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 236th Judicial District, Tarrant County, TX, case no. 236-320394-20, filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11328842) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Defendants' Original Answer, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet) (DePonte, Jennette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. doing business as Walmart #3773
Represented By: Jennette E DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: Jennette E DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC
Represented By: Jennette E DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Montgomery
Represented By: Lawrence Rolle
Represented By: Chad Christopher Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?