Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 7 Stars Liquor LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Iris L. Russell d/b/a Tastebuds Live and 7 Stars Liquor LLC d/b/a Tastebuds Live
Case Number: 4:2021cv00021
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (King, Jamie)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (King, Jamie)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Iris L. Russell ; served on 2/23/2021. (King, Jamie)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to 7 Stars Liquor LLC ; served on 2/23/2021. (King, Jamie)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's #8 Motion for Order of Substituted Service of Process. The Court finds that the Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs must serve Defendants in the substituted manner by March 5, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/19/2021) (mmw)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #8 MOTION for Order of Substituted Service of Process (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (King, Jamie)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Order of Substituted Service of Process filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by Iris L. Russell re: #5 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel. (mmw)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Court finds that it should be GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/8/2021) (mmw)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 7 Stars Liquor LLC and Iris L. Russell. (mmw)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11492416) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 7 Stars Liquor LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris L. Russell d/b/a Tastebuds Live
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 Stars Liquor LLC d/b/a Tastebuds Live
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?