Medical Air Services Association, Inc. v. CareFlite
Plaintiff: Medical Air Services Association, Inc.
Defendant: CareFlite
Case Number: 4:2021cv00153
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Assault, Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND: Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (doc. #7 ) on or before April 16, 2021, and Defendant shall file any reply to Plaintiff's response on or before April 30, 2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/6/2021) (bdb)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Medical Air Services Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wieser, Jay)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CareFlite with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher E Howe added to party CareFlite(pty:dft) (Howe, Christopher)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to CareFlite ; served on 2/22/2021. (Wieser, Jay)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CareFlite. (pef)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (pef)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Medical Air Services Association, Inc.. (Wieser, Jay)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medical Air Services Association, Inc.. (Wieser, Jay)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against CareFlite filed by Medical Air Services Association, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11605477) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s)) (Wieser, Jay) Modified docket entry on 2/12/2021 (pef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medical Air Services Association, Inc. v. CareFlite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareFlite
Represented By: Christopher E Howe
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Air Services Association, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Allman
Represented By: Jay K Wieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?