Garman v. Alcon Vision, LLC
Plaintiff: Ryan Garman
Defendant: Alcon Vision, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00906
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Alcon Vision, LLC. Waiver sent on 7/29/2021. (Martoccio, Gary)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie B Sherman on behalf of Ryan Garman. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sherman, Stephanie)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED on or before August 13, to either (1) file a status report explaining how his counsel satisfies the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a) (e.g., counsel's residence is in this district), or (2) file a notice of appearance of local counsel that satisfies the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/10/2021) (npk)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie B Sherman on behalf of Ryan Garman. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sherman, Stephanie)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Reed C. O'Connor recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Mark Pittman for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:21-cv-00906-P. (bcr) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/30/2021) (bcr).
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ryan Garman. (Martoccio, Gary)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Alcon Vision, LLC filed by Ryan Garman. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12095201) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Martoccio, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garman v. Alcon Vision, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Garman
Represented By: Gary Martoccio
Represented By: Stephanie B Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Vision, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?