Chandler v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Attmond D. Chandler
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 4:2021cv00980
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Cureton
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 USMS Process Receipt and Return/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration; served on 09/15/2021. (pef)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General of the US ; served on 9/14/2021. (sre)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration ; US Attorney served on 9/3/2021. (npk)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 Summons issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (tln)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/24/2021) (tln)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER PERMITTING FILING IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDER REGARDING COMPLETION OF FORMS and ISSUANCE OF PROCESS granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/24/2021) (tln)
August 24, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Tue Aug 24 09:37:13 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel filed by Attmond D. Chandler. (pef)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (tln)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (tln)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Attmond D. Chandler. (tln)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Attmond D. Chandler. (tln) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/20/2021) (pef).
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Attmond D. Chandler. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (tln)
August 19, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4,5. Thu Aug 19 14:00:03 CDT 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attmond D. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?