Downing v. Pondugula et al
Plaintiff: JaNe Downing
Defendant: Kishore Pondugula and Nephserv LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01006
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Downing shall file her response to the Motion on or before November 10, 2021. Also by that date, Downing shall file a brief that complies with the Local Civil Rules of the Northern District of Texas, specifically Rule 7.1(d) and Rule 7.2 (which require certain materials be included in a brief). The Local Civil Rules of the Northern District of Texas can be accessed online at the following address: http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/civil-rules. Defendants shall file their reply within seven days after Downing files her response, if any. Response due by 11/10/2021 re: #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 10/20/2021) (npk)
October 20, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Wed Oct 20 14:50:11 CDT 2021 (crt)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Nephserv LLC, Kishore Pondugula re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Insufficient Service (Gamble, David)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nephserv LLC, Kishore Pondugula (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David G Gamble added to party Nephserv LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David G Gamble added to party Kishore Pondugula(pty:dft) (Gamble, David)
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kishore Pondugula ; served on 9/23/2021. (npk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Plaintiff's complaint is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/27/2021) (jmg)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Nephserv LLC, Kishore Pondugula. (jmg)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The pro se plaintiff filed a complaint against the defendants and paid the filing fee. The plaintiff is now responsible for ensuring that each defendant is served with a summons and a copy of the complaint in this case, as provided by Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of the Court shall send summons forms for each defendant and a copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 to the plaintiff. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/27/2021) (Attachments: #1 Fed R Civ P 4) (jmg)
August 27, 2021 NEW CASE NUMBER 4:21-cv-01006-P Downing v. Pondugula et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:21-cv-02004-E. Future filings should reflect only the new case number and be directed to the proper division (see LR 5.1(a)). Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (twd)
August 27, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. w/NEF of case transfer Fri Aug 27 16:12:48 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 27, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 5. Fri Aug 27 14:42:14 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 27, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Aug 27 14:57:00 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 27, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Aug 27 14:46:33 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 26, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,4. Thu Aug 26 11:43:18 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ygl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nephserv LLC, Kishore Pondugula. (ygl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Nephserv LLC, Kishore Pondugula filed by JaNe Downing. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number DS133293/DS133294) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ygl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downing v. Pondugula et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JaNe Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kishore Pondugula
Represented By: David G Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nephserv LLC
Represented By: David G Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?