Velasco v. Parker Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Antonio Velasco
Defendant: Parker Products, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01083
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Parker Products, Inc. re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Johnson, Jacqueline)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Parker Products, Inc. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT of Attorney Conference filed by Parker Products, Inc.. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion for Extension to file Joint Report. ECF No. #8 . Having considered the Joint Motion, the Court concludes it should be and hereby is GRANTED. Therefore, it is ORDERED that the deadline to file the Joint Report is EXTENDED up to and including November 15, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/2/2021) (pef)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report filed by Antonio Velasco (Crocker, Ali)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Parker Products, Inc. filed by Antonio Velasco. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Crocker, Ali)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel shall prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order ("Joint Report"). The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 2, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/5/2021) (pef)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) on or before October 26, 2021, Plaintiff file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the undersigned's judge-specific requirements; and, (2) on or before November 16, 2021, Defendant file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/5/2021) (pef)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Parker Products, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parker Products, Inc.. (Johnson, Jacqueline)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Parker Products, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12248028) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental, #3 Exhibit(s) Index of Filed State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit(s) State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit(s) Original Petition, #6 Exhibit(s) Service Request Form, #7 Exhibit(s) Return of Service) (Johnson, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasco v. Parker Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Velasco
Represented By: Ali Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline C Johnson
Represented By: J Hunter Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?