Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Reytech Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Reytech Services, LLC
Garnishee: First National Bank Baird dba First Bank of Texas
Case Number: 4:2021cv01097
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First National Bank Baird. (Agnew, Randy)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment,,,, filed by First National Bank Baird. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Randy Agnew added to party First National Bank Baird(pty:gar) (Agnew, Randy)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to First National Bank Baird ; served on 9/30/2021. (Cannon, Steven)
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Reytech Services, LLC ; served on 10/1/2021. (Cannon, Steven)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to First National Bank Baird ; served on 9/29/2021. (Cannon, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 Writ of Garnishment Issued as to First National Bank Baird dba First Bank of Texas. (mmw)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to First National Bank Baird dba First Bank of Texas and Reytech Services, LLC. (mmw)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Writ of Garnishment filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cannon, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons - Reytech filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cannon, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons - First National filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cannon, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cannon, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12261794) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. 2, #3 Cover Sheet) (Cannon, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Reytech Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan D Dry
Represented By: Steven K Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reytech Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: First National Bank Baird dba First Bank of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?