Foley v. Biden
Plaintiff: Mr. David Adrian Foley and David A. Foley
Defendant: President Joseph R Biden, Jr and Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01098
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr re: #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (expedited consideration requested) (Myers, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by David A. Foley re: #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (expedited consideration requested) (Foley, David)
November 22, 2021 Filing 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (expedited consideration requested) filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Myers, Steven)
November 12, 2021 Filing 22 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint to include NLRB and SFWTF Defendants filed by David A. Foley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Draft Amended Complaint) (Foley, David)
October 29, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr re: #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint to include NLRB and SFWTF Defendants (Myers, Steven)
October 13, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by David A. Foley re: #18 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Foley, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint to include NLRB and SFWTF Defendants filed by David A. Foley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Foley, David)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: The #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Further, Plaintiff will be given an opportunity to file a response addressing why this case against President Biden should not be dismissed. This response MUST be filed on or before October 13, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/6/2021) (pef)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 Appendix in Support filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr re #16 Response/Objection (Myers, Steven)
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr re: #4 First MOTION for Injunction of Executive Order Mandating Injections (Myers, Steven)
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Charles Merritt on behalf of Joseph R. Biden, Jr. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Merritt, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph John DeMott on behalf of Joseph R. Biden, Jr. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (DeMott, Joseph)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Andrew Myers on behalf of Joseph R. Biden, Jr. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Myers, Steven)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Stephen Flickinger. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/4/2021) (chmb)
October 3, 2021 Filing 11 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS/INDEX TO COMPLAINT APPENDIX to #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff David A. Foley. (Foley, David) Modified document title on 10/4/2021 (pef).
October 2, 2021 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12270463) filed by David A. Foley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Daniel Stephen Flickinger added to party David A. Foley(pty:pla) (Flickinger, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #4 ), filed September 29, 2021. If Defendant opposes Plaintiff's request, Defendant shall respond on or before October 5, 2021 at 1:00 P.M. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/1/2021) (pef)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David A. Foley re #1 Complaint,,,, #4 First MOTION for Injunction of Executive Order Mandating Injections, #6 Summons Issued (Foley, David)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's First Motion for Injunction (ECF No. #4 ), filed September 29, 2021. Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides a court may issue an injunction only upon notice to the adverse party and a temporary restraining order without notice only when the movant establishes specific reasons. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65. Accordingly, Plaintiff must either provide notice to the United States through the United States Attorneys Office or otherwise meet the requirements of Rule 65. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/30/2021) (pef)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Joseph R. Biden, Jr, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (pef)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Injunction of Executive Order Mandating Injections filed by David Adrian Foley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Injunction) (Foley, David)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff David Adrian Foley. (Foley, David)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Adrian Foley. (Foley, David)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Adrian Foley filed by David Adrian Foley. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12262360) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Verification of Complaint) (Foley, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foley v. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. David Adrian Foley
Represented By: David Adrian Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Foley
Represented By: David Adrian Foley
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Flickinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Joseph R Biden, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen P Fahey-DOJ
Represented By: Joseph John DeMott
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Steven Andrew Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?